James S. Feltman v. Culmin Staffing Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: James S. Feltman
Defendant: Culmin Staffing Group, Inc.
In Re: Corporate Resource Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07811
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 18-1008A, 15-B-12329 (MG). /Plaintiff's Sur-Reply to Culmin Staffing Group, Inc.'s Motion to Withdraw the Reference. Document filed by James S. Feltman. (Marecki, Patrick)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's August 20, 2019 motion to withdraw the bankruptcy reference (Dkt. #1), Plaintiff's September 10, 2019 opposition (Dkt. #8), and Defendant's September 17, 2019 reply thereto (Dkt. #9). The Court has reviewed the parties' submissions and understands that since Plaintiff filed his opposition brief there have been developments before the bankruptcy court that may have changed Plaintiff's position regarding the motion. Therefore, the Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to file a sur-reply of five pages or less, on or before October 18, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Surreplies due by 10/18/2019.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/7/2019) (rro)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 18-1008A, 15-B-12329 (MG). . Document filed by Culmin Staffing Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Marino, Christopher)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 18-1008A, 15-B-12329 (MG). /Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Limited Opposition to Culmin Staffing Group, Inc.'s Motion to Withdraw the Reference. Document filed by James S. Feltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Marecki Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Marecki, Patrick)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #6 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Patrick Marecki, Esq. and Christopher J. Marino, Esq. dated September 5, 2019 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule. Document filed by James S. Feltman. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: The Trustee's response to Defendant Culmin's motion to withdraw the reference (Dkt. #1) is due September 10, 2019; and Defendant Culmin's reply is due September 24, 2019. So ordered. (Responses due by 9/10/2019. Replies due by 9/24/2019.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/5/2019) (rjm)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Patrick Marecki, Esq. and Christopher J. Marino, Esq. dated September 5, 2019 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule. Document filed by James S. Feltman.(Marecki, Patrick)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Daniel Marecki on behalf of James S. Feltman. (Marecki, Patrick)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Neil Berger on behalf of James S. Feltman. (Berger, Neil)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Culmin Staffing Group, Inc..(Marino, Christopher)
August 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
August 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bkar)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 18-1008A, 15-B-12329 (MG).Document filed by Culmin Staffing Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration - Ex. A, #4 Declaration - Ex. B, #5 Declaration - Ex. C)(bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James S. Feltman v. Culmin Staffing Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Corporate Resource Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Culmin Staffing Group, Inc.
Represented By: Donald F. Campbell
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James S. Feltman
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Marecki
Represented By: Steven Salvador Flores
Represented By: Neil Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?