Barrett v. Rosario et al
Plaintiff: Chandra K. Barrett
Defendant: Aspen Landscaping Contracting, Inc., Ruben Rosario and Ruben R. Rosario
Case Number: 1:2019cv07815
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1442nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time and place listed below. DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: November 12, 2019. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: November 19, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/19/2019) (ama)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Aspen Landscaping Contracting, Inc., Ruben R. Rosario. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Cohen, Jack)
August 31, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Chandra K. Barrett(Cassell, Michael)
August 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael David Cassell on behalf of Chandra K. Barrett. (Cassell, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jack L. Cohen, I on behalf of Aspen Landscaping Contracting, Inc., Ruben R. Rosario. (Cohen, Jack)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: D. Bradford Sessa, New Attorney: Jack L. Cohen, Address: Goldberg Segalla LLP, 711 3rd Avenue, Suite 1900, New York, NY, USA 10017, 6462928759. Document filed by Aspen Landscaping Contracting, Inc., Ruben R. Rosario. (Cohen, Jack)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Aspen Landscaping Contracting, Inc., Ruben R. Rosario.(Sessa, Donald)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Summons & Complaint in Supreme Court Action, #3 Affidavit Certificate of Service & Backer)(Sessa, Donald)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: This action was removed from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx, on August 20, 2019. Dkt. No. 1. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed no later than September 23, 2019. Additionally, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Defendant is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff, and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 9/23/2019.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/21/2019) (ama)
August 21, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
August 21, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
August 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Donald Bradford Sessa. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
August 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Donald Bradford Sessa. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ruben R. Rosario. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
August 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Donald Bradford Sessa to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 29402/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17463130).Document filed by Aspen Landscaping Contracting, Inc., Ruben Rosario. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Service & Backer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sessa, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett v. Rosario et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Landscaping Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Bradford Sessa
Represented By: Jack L. Cohen, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Rosario
Represented By: Donald Bradford Sessa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben R. Rosario
Represented By: Donald Bradford Sessa
Represented By: Jack L. Cohen, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra K. Barrett
Represented By: Michael David Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?