SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc. v. AIG Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: AIG Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv07859
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Greil I. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17557131. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Greil I. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17557131. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AIG Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Roberts, Greil)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joanna Marie Doherty on behalf of AIG Specialty Insurance Company. (Doherty, Joanna)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. AIG Specialty Insurance Company served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. Service was accepted by Natasha Carter, Administrator. Document filed by SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc.. (Smith, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Hartmann Smith on behalf of SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc.. (Smith, James)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/27/2019) (jwh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AIG Specialty Insurance Company. (sj)
August 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
August 22, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AIG Specialty Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc.. (Cohen, Robin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc..(Cohen, Robin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cohen, Robin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AIG Specialty Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17470004)Document filed by SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cohen, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc. v. AIG Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Robin L. Cohen
Represented By: James Hartmann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Joanna Marie Doherty
Represented By: Greil Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?