Malloy v. Cuomo et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Malloy
Defendant: Tina M. Stanford and Andrew Cuomo
Case Number: 1:2019cv07903
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Mailed a copy of #8 Order of Dismissal, #9 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), Notice of Appeal Forms, to Anthony Malloy DIN No. 14A1041 Mid-State Correctional Facility P.O. Box 2500 Marcy, NY 13403. (vba)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice under the Prison Litigation Reform Act's "three-strikes" rule. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Plaintiff continues to be barred from filing any civil action under the in forma pauperis (IFP) statute while a prisoner unless Plaintiff is under imminent danger of serious physical injury. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/26/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Court denies Plaintiff's request to proceed IFP, and the complaint is dismissed without prejudice under the PLRA's "three-strikes" rule. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Plaintiff remains barred from filing any future action IFP while in custody, unless he is under imminent threat of serious physical injury. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/26/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 26, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm)
September 16, 2019 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of Docket Sheet to Anthony Malloy DIN #14A1041 at Mid-State Correctional Facility, Marcy, NY 13403 on 9/16/2019. (bwa)
September 13, 2019 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Received: Re (6 in 1:19-cv-07906-UA, 7 in 1:19-cv-07903-UA) Letter. Request for Docket Report, from Anthony Malloy received on 9/13/19. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from A. Molloy, dated 9/9/19 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that he is waiting for a response from the Court of two cases which he sent to the Courthouse; and that he wants to file two documents before the deadline of 11/13/19. Document filed by Anthony Malloy, Anthony Malloy.(sc)
September 10, 2019 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed letter to Anthony Malloy DIN# 14A1041 at Mid-State Correctional Facility P.O. Box 2500 Marcy, NY 13403 advising that copy/copies of the All documents filed requested will be furnished upon receipt of the statutory fee of $25.00 in the form of a company check, certified check or money order payable to the Clerk of the Court, SDNY. (jri)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from A. Malloy dated 8/28/19 re: CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FOR MERCANDISE NO. 7017-1000-0001-0321-7288 MALLOY V. C.O. BARRY ET AL./ CERT. MAIL RECEIPT FOR MERCHANDISE NO. 7003-1010-0002-6301-8699 MALLOY V. CUOMO ET AL.. Document filed by Anthony Malloy.(sc)
September 9, 2019 Request for Copies of Documents Received: Re #5 Letter,. Request for copy of his letters written between 8/22/19 to 8/28/19.from A. Molloy received on 9/9/19. Transmission to Records Management for processing. (sc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from A. Malloy, dated 9/3/19 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that his new address is as follows: Mid-State Corr. Facility, P.O. Box 2500, Marcy, New York 13403; and that he requests that the Court send him the two letters which he wrote at Downstate Correctional Facility during 8/22/19 to 8/28/19. Document filed by Anthony Malloy, Anthony Malloy.(sc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Anthony Malloy, dated 8/22/19 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that his new address is the following: Downstate Corr. Facility, Box F, Red Schoolhouse Road, Fishkill, NY 12524-0445. Document filed by Anthony Malloy.(sc)
August 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Anthony Malloy.(sac)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Andrew Cuomo, Tina M. Stanford. Document filed by Anthony Malloy. (sac)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Anthony Malloy.(sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malloy v. Cuomo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina M. Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?