Khan v. Zerafa et al
Plaintiff: Hasan A Khan
Defendant: John J Zerafa, The City Of New York,, EAN Holdings, LLC and City Of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv07909
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 22 1002 903 2 on 10/9/2019. (cf)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE WITHOUT PREJUDICE: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned parties, by their respective counsel, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), as follows: 1. Plaintiff's claims against only the Federal Defendant in this action are dismissed without prejudice. 2. This action is hereby remanded to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York, as there is no longer federal subject matter jurisdiction due to the dismissal of the Federal Defendant. (As further set forth in this Order.) John J Zerafa terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/9/2019) (cf) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by John J Zerafa. (Cowart, Brandon)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer APPLICATION GRANTED. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is adjourned to ten days after a determination is made regarding Plaintiff's request to file a motion to remand (Dkt 7) and, if necessary, a motion to remand. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/30/2019) (rro)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brandon Cowart dated September 27, 2019. Document filed by John J Zerafa.(Cowart, Brandon)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #7 Letter filed by Hasan A Khan. ENDORSEMENT: The initial conference is set for October 17, 2019 (Dkt 6). Defendant shall file a response to this letter by October 10, 2019. The response shall comply with the Court's Individual Rules regarding the submission of pre-motion letters. The parties are reminded that they must file pre-conference material by October 10, 2019. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/23/2019) (cf)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Phyllis Gail Calistro on behalf of City Of New York. (Calistro, Phyllis)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Barbara Hutter dated September 13, 2019 re: Objection of Deft. ZERAFA Notice of Removal. Document filed by Hasan A Khan.(Aviles, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/6/2019) (kv)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. APPLICATION GRANTED. Defendant Zerafa shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by September 30, 2019. John J Zerafa answer due 9/30/2019. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/27/2019) (jca)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal; Docket No. 3 (Letter to Court Dated August 26, 2019) served on Hasan A. Khan, EAN Holdings, LLC, and The City of New York on August 26, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by John J Zerafa. (Cowart, Brandon)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brandon Cowart dated August 26, 2017. Document filed by John J Zerafa.(Cowart, Brandon)
August 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code none (no fee required);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (pc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cowart, Brandon)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 152557/2019..Document filed by John J Zerafa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Employment Certification))(Cowart, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Zerafa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J Zerafa
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Of New York,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: Phyllis Gail Calistro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hasan A Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?