Coleman-Bey v. Childrens Aid Society et al
Plaintiff: Bro Bashiri Coleman-Bey
Defendant: Maria Burgos, Alexis Barber-Daris, Childrens Aid Society, Victoria Kalumbi and Jessica Victoria-Silk
Case Number: 1:2019cv07911
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Mailed a copy of #6 Order Granting IFP Application to Bro Bashiri Coleman-Bey c/o 300 W. 142 St. Apt. 3 New York, NY 10030. (aea)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/23/2019) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 1:19-cv-04678. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. 28 U.S.C. 1391(b), 1404(a). A decision on Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is reserved for the transferee court. That provision of Rule 83.1 of the Local Rules of the Eastern District of New York, which requires a seven-day delay is waived. Case transferred to District of Southern District Of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.. SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 8/16/2019. C/mailed to Pro se Plaintiff. (Tavarez, Jennifer) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bro Bashiri Coleman-Bey. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/23/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexis Barber-Daris, Maria Burgos, Childrens Aid Society, Victoria Kalumbi, Jessica Victoria-Silk, filed by Bro Bashiri Coleman-Bey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman-Bey v. Childrens Aid Society et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Burgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis Barber-Daris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Childrens Aid Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Kalumbi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Victoria-Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bro Bashiri Coleman-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?