Matchroom Boxing Limited v. TGB Promotions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Matchroom Boxing Limited
Defendant: Andres Ponce Ruiz and TGB Promotions LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv07912
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John S. Wirt dated 10/4/2019 re: we would respectfully request that the Court order that the documents be unsealed. ENDORSEMENT: This is an ex parte communication in a closed and dismissed case. Application DENIED without prejudice to renewal with notice and appointment to be heard by counsel for all parties to the action. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/8/2019) (jwh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Andres Ponce Ruiz, TGB Promotions LLC. Document filed by Matchroom Boxing Limited. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Kiernan, John)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Notice to attorney John Kiernan to DO NOT RE-FILE Document No. #9 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Document already signed by the Judge and filed on ECF Doc.# 5. (dt)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 Proposed Order, #5 Order to Show Cause,,,,,, . Document filed by Matchroom Boxing Limited. (Kiernan, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Palmer in Support re: #9 Proposed Order, #5 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,. Document filed by Matchroom Boxing Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, June 4, 2019 email from Frank Smith to Tom Brown and Phil Weiss., #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, August 6, 2019 email from Eddie Hearn to Tom Brown., #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, email chain beginning with June 19, 2019 email from Tom Brown to Eddie Hearn., #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, email chain beginning with August 11, 2019 email from David Garcia to Tom Brown., #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, email chain beginning with August 14, 2019 email from Shaun Palmer to Margaret Goodman of VADA., #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, August 14, 2014 email from Debevoise & Plimpton LLP to David Garcia and Phil Weiss, #7 Exhibit AEx. 6A, August 14, 2014 email from Debevoise & Plimpton LLP to David Garcia and Phil Weiss, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7, July 11, 2019 TMZ article., #9 Exhibit Ex. 8, July 24, 2019 tweet from Ruiz., #10 Exhibit Ex. 9, July 24, 2019 tweet from Ruiz., #11 Exhibit Ex. 10, August 6, 2019 tweet from Ruiz., #12 Exhibit Ex. 11, August 13, 2019 ESPN article., #13 Exhibit Ex. 12, August 14, 2019 BBC article., #14 Exhibit Ex. 13, August 14, 2019 Pulev Appeal Letter., #15 Exhibit Ex. 14, August 16, 2019 email from Phil Weiss to Debevoise & Plimpton LLP., #16 Exhibit Ex. 15, August 16. 2019 email from Eddie Hearn to Tom Brown.)(Kiernan, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of John S. Kiernan in Support re: #9 Proposed Order, #5 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,. Document filed by Matchroom Boxing Limited. (Kiernan, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Matchroom Boxing Limited. Related Document Number: #5 . (Kiernan, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 8/26/2019 (dt).
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 Order,, Re Sealing Documents. Document filed by Matchroom Boxing Limited. (Kiernan, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Andres Ponce Ruiz, TGB Promotions LLC. Document filed by Matchroom Boxing Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Slip sheet for filed under seal exhibit)(Kiernan, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Plaintiffs motion to file papers in support of a preliminary injunction motion under seal, including the Affidavit of Shaun Palmer as well as papers that quote or discuss provisions of the parties' Provision of Services Agreement (Exhibit 1 to the Complaint), is provisionally GRANTED.(See below) Versions of the above sealed documents, and any supporting documents and exhibits, with confidential information redacted shall be filed electronically. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/23/2019) (js) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: ORDERED, that defendants show cause before this Honorable Court, at Room 11D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, in the City, County and State of New York, September 9, 2019, at 2 o'clock PM thereof, or as soon thereafter as counsel may be heard, why an order should not be issued pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure (a) declaring that defendants are in breach of the Provision of Services Agreement dated April 30, 2019; and (b) enjoining defendant Ruiz from engaging in any bouts, and defendant TGB Promotions LLC from promoting any bouts in which Mr. Ruiz is a participant, until the earlier of (i) eighteen (18) months from the date of the order or (ii) their confirmation that they will abide by their contractual obligations to continue with the Rematch Bout as contracted and scheduled, and Mr. Ruiz's having fought in the Rematch Bout; and it is further ORDERED that personal service of a copy of this order and annexed declaration upon the defendants or his counsel on or before August 23, 2019 at 5 o'clock PM It is further ordered that service of Answering Papers shall be via ECF on or before 2:00 p.m. on August 30, 2019; and it is further ordered that service of Reply Paper shall be via ECF on or before 12:00 P.M. on September 6, 2019. So Ordered. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/9/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/23/2019) (js)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
August 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 DOCUMENTS TO BE SEALED (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/23/2019) (pc) (pc).
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matchroom Boxing Limited v. TGB Promotions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andres Ponce Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TGB Promotions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matchroom Boxing Limited
Represented By: John S. Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?