Schwartz v. NorthStar Realty Europe Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Schwartz
Defendant: Dianne Hurley, Richard Brett Saltzman, Mahbod Nia, Oscar J. Junquera, Thomas J. Barrack, Jr., NorthStar Realty Europe Corp., Judith A. Hannaway, Wesley D. Minami and Mario Chisholm
Case Number: 1:2019cv07915
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Thomas J. Barrack, Jr, Mario Chisholm, Judith A. Hannaway, Dianne Hurley, Oscar J. Junquera, Wesley D. Minami, Mahbod Nia, NorthStar Realty Europe Corp., Richard Brett Saltzman. Document filed by Michael Schwartz. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Wilson, James)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/5/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/5/2019) (jca)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas J. Barrack, Jr, Mario Chisholm, Judith A. Hannaway, Dianne Hurley, Oscar J. Junquera, Wesley D. Minami, Mahbod Nia, NorthStar Realty Europe Corp., Richard Brett Saltzman. (pc)
August 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James Milligan Wilson, Jr.. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Michael Schwartz. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NorthStar Realty Europe Corp., Richard Brett Saltzman, Judith A. Hannaway, Mahbod Nia, Thomas J. Barrack, Jr., Wesley D. Minami, Oscar J. Junquera, Dianne Hurley, and Mario Chisholm, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Schwartz. (Wilson, James)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wilson, James)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas J. Barrack, Jr, Mario Chisholm, Judith A. Hannaway, Dianne Hurley, Oscar J. Junquera, Wesley D. Minami, Mahbod Nia, NorthStar Realty Europe Corp., Richard Brett Saltzman. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17481984)Document filed by Michael Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Proposed Lead Plaintiff)(Wilson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwartz v. NorthStar Realty Europe Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianne Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Brett Saltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahbod Nia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar J. Junquera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Barrack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NorthStar Realty Europe Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith A. Hannaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley D. Minami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Chisholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schwartz
Represented By: James Milligan Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?