Barker v. Lighthouse Guild International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Barker
Defendant: Guildnet, Inc. and Lighthouse Guild International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07916
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Taimur Alamgir to RE-FILE Document #9 MOTION for Taimur Alamgir to Withdraw as Attorney . ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #'s. (db)
October 20, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Taimur Alamgir to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Kimberly Barker.(Alamgir, Taimur) Modified on 10/21/2019 (db).
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Lighthouse Guild International, Inc. waiver sent on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. Document filed by Kimberly Barker. (Alamgir, Taimur)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lighthouse Guild International, Inc.. (pc)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Guildnet, Inc.. (pc)
August 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Taimur Alamgir on behalf of Kimberly Barker. (Alamgir, Taimur)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Guildnet, Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kimberly Barker. (Lee, C.K.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lighthouse Guild International, INC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kimberly Barker. (Lee, C.K.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lee, C.K.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Guildnet, Inc., Lighthouse Guild International, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17482290)Document filed by Kimberly Barker.(Lee, C.K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Lighthouse Guild International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Barker
Represented By: Taimur Alamgir
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guildnet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighthouse Guild International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?