Boffoli v. Chandler
Plaintiff: Christopher Boffoli
Defendant: Marc Chandler
Case Number: 1:2019cv07932
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marc Chandler. (dnh)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Marc Chandler, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Boffoli. (Du Wors, John)
August 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John David Du Wors to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; This party was already previously issued a summons. If you require a new summons, you may request an amended summons. Please include the word "amended" in front of "summons in a civil action";. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED TO PARTY - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marc Chandler, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Boffoli. (Du Wors, John) Modified on 8/30/2019 (pc).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/26/2019) (jwh)
August 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John David Du Wors. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pne)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marc Chandler. (pne)
August 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Du Wors, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marc Chandler, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Boffoli. (Du Wors, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Du Wors, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marc Chandler. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17484589)Document filed by Christopher Boffoli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Du Wors, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boffoli v. Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Boffoli
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?