Picon v. Andrea Rosen Gallery, Inc.
Plaintiff: Yelitza Picon
Defendant: Andrea Rosen Gallery, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07939
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12102
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT DECREE: THE COURT, HAVING CONSIDERED the pleadings, law, underlying facts and having reviewed this proposed Consent Decree, FINDS AS FOLLOWS: This Court has personal jurisdiction over Plaintiff and Defendant for the purposes of this lawsuit pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1331. The provisions of this Consent Decree shall be binding upon the Parties. Entry of this Consent Decree is in the public interest. This Consent Decree is for settlement purposes only and does not constitute an admission by Defendant of any of the allegations contained in the Complaint or any other pleading in this lawsuit, nor does it constitute any finding of liability against Defendant. The Plaintiff is acting as a private attorney general in bringing this lawsuit and enforcing the ADA. This Consent Decree shall be deemed as adjudicating, once and for all, the merits of each and every claim, matter, and issue that was alleged, or could have been alleged by Plaintiff based on, or arising out of, or in connection with, the allegations in the Complaint. NOW THEREFORE, the Court approves the Consent Decree and in doing so specifically adopts it and makes it an Order of the Court and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/7/2019) (rro)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by Andrea Rosen Gallery, Inc.. (DiPalma, Joseph)
September 19, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #11 ORDER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (yv)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that this case has been or will be settled, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made within thirty days. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/19/2019) (rj)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement with prejudice. Document filed by Yelitza Picon. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/17/2019) Andrea Rosen Gallery, Inc. answer due 10/17/2019 (ks)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Joseph J. DiPalma dated 09/16/19. Document filed by Andrea Rosen Gallery, Inc..(DiPalma, Joseph)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph James DiPalma on behalf of Andrea Rosen Gallery, Inc.. (DiPalma, Joseph)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Andrea Rosen Gallery, Inc. served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. Service was accepted by Debra Stasi, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Yelitza Picon. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrea Rosen Gallery, Inc.. (sj)
August 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
August 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
August 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrea Rosen Gallery, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yelitza Picon. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrea Rosen Gallery, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17487112)Document filed by Yelitza Picon.(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Picon v. Andrea Rosen Gallery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yelitza Picon
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Rosen Gallery, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph James DiPalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?