Porricelli v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Porricelli
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC, Encore Capital Group, Inc. and Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07992
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Midland Funding, LLC served on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. Service was accepted by Legal Representative of CSC, Defendant Midland Funding LLC's Registered Agent. Document filed by Lisa Porricelli. (Bromberg, Brian)
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. Service was accepted by Legal Representative of CSC, Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc.'s Registered Agent. Document filed by Lisa Porricelli. (Bromberg, Brian)
September 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Midland Credit Management, Inc. answer due 11/4/2019; Midland Funding, LLC answer due 11/4/2019. (ne)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/11/2019) (ne)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Credit Management, Inc.. Document filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc..(Corwin, Matthew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Funding, LLC. Document filed by Midland Funding, LLC.(Corwin, Matthew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Matthew B. Corwin dated September 11, 2019. Document filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC.(Corwin, Matthew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc..(Corwin, Matthew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Blake Corwin, Esq on behalf of Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Corwin, Matthew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ellen Beth Silverman on behalf of Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Silverman, Ellen)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Encore Capital Group, Inc. waiver sent on 9/4/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. Document filed by Lisa Porricelli. (Bromberg, Brian)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Encore Capital Group, Inc. (vf)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Midland Funding, LLC. (vf)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. (vf)
August 31, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Encore Capital Group, Inc. formerly MCM Capital Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lisa Porricelli. (Bromberg, Brian)
August 31, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Midland Funding, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lisa Porricelli. (Bromberg, Brian)
August 31, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Midland Credit Management, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lisa Porricelli. (Bromberg, Brian)
August 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bromberg, Brian)
August 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Brian Lewis Bromberg. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17496429)Document filed by Lisa Porricelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Bromberg, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porricelli v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Blake Corwin, Esq.
Represented By: Ellen Beth Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encore Capital Group, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Blake Corwin, Esq.
Represented By: Ellen Beth Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Blake Corwin, Esq.
Represented By: Ellen Beth Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Porricelli
Represented By: Brian Lewis Bromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?