Allen et al v. New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision et al
Plaintiff: Spencer Jackson, Wayne Stewart, Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Shannon Dickinson, Rashid Rahman, Angel Hernandez, Terry Mathis, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Eddie Fields, Mark Daniels, Derrick Williams, Hugh Knight, Aaron Dockery, John Gradia, Michael Vattiato, Harold Ortiz and Sean Pritchett
Defendant: Kathleen Mantaro, MD, John Doe #2, MD, Jon Miller, MD, Carl Koenigsmann, MD, Jane or John Doe, NP or PA #1 - #50, John Morley, MD, Paula Bozer, MD, David S. Dinello, MD, Peter Braselman, MD, Chun Lee, MD, Mary Ashong, NP, Albert Acrish, NP, Jane or John Doe, MD #3 - # 50, John Hammer, MD, John Doe #1, MD, David Karandy, MD, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, Ann Andola, MD, Mikhail Gusman, MD, Kristin Salotti, NP and Susan Mueller, MD
Interested Party: New York State Office of the Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2019cv08173
Filed: September 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: granting #50 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. No further extensions will be granted. SO ORDERED. Albert Acrish, NP answer due 12/20/2019; Ann Andola, MD answer due 12/20/2019; Mary Ashong, NP answer due 12/20/2019; Paula Bozer, MD answer due 12/20/2019; Peter Braselman, MD answer due 12/20/2019; David S. Dinello, MD answer due 12/20/2019; Mikhail Gusman, MD answer due 12/20/2019; John Hammer, MD answer due 12/20/2019; David Karandy, MD answer due 12/20/2019; Carl Koenigsmann, MD answer due 12/20/2019; Chun Lee, MD answer due 12/20/2019; Kathleen Mantaro, MD answer due 12/20/2019; Jon Miller, MD answer due 12/20/2019; John Morley, MD answer due 12/20/2019; Susan Mueller, MD answer due 12/20/2019; New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision answer due 12/20/2019; Kristin Salotti, NP answer due 12/20/2019. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/09/2019) (ama)
October 8, 2019 Filing 50 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from AAG Yan Fu dated October 8, 2019. Document filed by New York State Office of the Attorney General.(Fu, Yan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Susan Mueller, MD served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. Service was accepted by Laura Rhodes. Document filed by John Gradia; Michael Vattiato; Brian Bernard; Peter Allen; Derrick Williams; Wayne Stewart; Rashid Rahman; Hugh Knight; Terry Mathis; Sean Pritchett; Eddie Fields; Mark Daniels; Spencer Jackson; Harold Ortiz; Felipe Rivera-Cruz; Angel Hernandez; Shannon Dickinson; Aaron Dockery. (Agnew, Amy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mikhail Gusman, MD served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. Service was accepted by Elizabeth Jennings. Document filed by John Gradia; Michael Vattiato; Brian Bernard; Peter Allen; Derrick Williams; Wayne Stewart; Rashid Rahman; Hugh Knight; Terry Mathis; Sean Pritchett; Eddie Fields; Mark Daniels; Spencer Jackson; Harold Ortiz; Felipe Rivera-Cruz; Angel Hernandez; Shannon Dickinson; Aaron Dockery. (Agnew, Amy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. John Hammer, MD served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. Service was accepted by John Hammer. Document filed by John Gradia; Michael Vattiato; Brian Bernard; Peter Allen; Derrick Williams; Wayne Stewart; Rashid Rahman; Hugh Knight; Terry Mathis; Sean Pritchett; Eddie Fields; Mark Daniels; Spencer Jackson; Harold Ortiz; Felipe Rivera-Cruz; Angel Hernandez; Shannon Dickinson; Aaron Dockery. (Agnew, Amy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Chun Lee, MD served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. Service was accepted by Karen Hansen. Document filed by John Gradia; Michael Vattiato; Brian Bernard; Peter Allen; Derrick Williams; Wayne Stewart; Rashid Rahman; Hugh Knight; Terry Mathis; Sean Pritchett; Eddie Fields; Mark Daniels; Spencer Jackson; Harold Ortiz; Felipe Rivera-Cruz; Angel Hernandez; Shannon Dickinson; Aaron Dockery. (Agnew, Amy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Ann Andola, MD served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. Service was accepted by Elizabeth Jennings. Document filed by John Gradia; Michael Vattiato; Brian Bernard; Peter Allen; Derrick Williams; Wayne Stewart; Rashid Rahman; Hugh Knight; Terry Mathis; Sean Pritchett; Eddie Fields; Mark Daniels; Spencer Jackson; Harold Ortiz; Felipe Rivera-Cruz; Angel Hernandez; Shannon Dickinson; Aaron Dockery. (Agnew, Amy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mary Ashong, NP served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. Service was accepted by C. Murphy Authorized Representative. Document filed by John Gradia; Michael Vattiato; Brian Bernard; Peter Allen; Derrick Williams; Wayne Stewart; Rashid Rahman; Hugh Knight; Terry Mathis; Sean Pritchett; Eddie Fields; Mark Daniels; Spencer Jackson; Harold Ortiz; Felipe Rivera-Cruz; Angel Hernandez; Shannon Dickinson; Aaron Dockery. (Agnew, Amy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Albert Acrish, NP served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. Service was accepted by C. Murphy Authorized Representative. Document filed by John Gradia; Michael Vattiato; Brian Bernard; Peter Allen; Derrick Williams; Wayne Stewart; Rashid Rahman; Hugh Knight; Terry Mathis; Sean Pritchett; Eddie Fields; Mark Daniels; Spencer Jackson; Harold Ortiz; Felipe Rivera-Cruz; Angel Hernandez; Shannon Dickinson; Aaron Dockery. (Agnew, Amy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 42 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kathleen Mantaro, MD. (jgo)
September 30, 2019 Filing 41 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jon Miller, MD. (jgo)
September 28, 2019 Filing 40 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Jon Miller MD, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 28, 2019 Filing 39 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Kathleen Mantaro MD, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 11, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:15-cv-01955-LAP. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
September 11, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
September 10, 2019 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kristin Salotti, NP. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Susan Mueller, MD. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Morley, MD. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jon Miller, MD. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kathleen Mantaro, MD. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chun Lee, MD. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carl Koenigsmann, MD. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Karandy, MD. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Hammer, MD. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mikhail Gusman, MD. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David S. Dinello, MD. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peter Braselman, MD. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paula Bozer, MD. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mary Ashong, NP. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ann Andola, MD. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Albert Acrish, NP. (dnh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kristin Salotti, NP, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Susan Mueller, MD, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Morley, MD, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jon Miller, MD, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kathleen Mantaro, MD, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chun Lee, MD, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carl Koengismann, MD, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Karandy, MD, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Hammer, MD, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mikhail Gusman, MD, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David S. Dinello, MD, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Peter Braselman, MD, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paula Bozer, MD, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mary Ashong, NP, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ann Andola, MD, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Albert Acrish, NP, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams. (Agnew, Amy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 15-cv-1955. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams.(Agnew, Amy)
September 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Amy Jane Agnew. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains. (vf)
September 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Amy Jane Agnew. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John Gradia, Michael Vattiato, Brian Bernard, Peter Allen, Derrick Williams, Wayne Stewart, Rashid Rahman, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Sean Pritchett, Eddie Fields, Mark Daniels, Spencer Jackson, Harold Ortiz, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Angel Hernandez, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
September 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Amy Jane Agnew to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the related case statement. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
September 3, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Loretta A. Preska as possibly related to 15-cv-1955. (vf)
September 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
September 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 2, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Amy Jane Agnew re: that this action be filed as related to 15-cv-1955. Document filed by Peter Allen, Brian Bernard, Mark Daniels, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery, Eddie Fields, John Gradia, Angel Hernandez, Spencer Jackson, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Harold Ortiz, Sean Pritchett, Rashid Rahman, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Wayne Stewart, Michael Vattiato, Derrick Williams.(Agnew, Amy) Modified on 9/3/2019 (vf).
September 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Agnew, Amy)
September 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albert Acrish, NP, Ann Andola, MD, Mary Ashong, NP, Paula Bozer, MD, Peter Braselman, MD, David S. Dinello, MD, John Doe #1, MD, John Doe #2, MD, Jane or John Doe, MD #3 - # 50, Jane or John Doe, NP or PA #1 - #50, Mikhail Gusman, MD, John Hammer, MD, David Karandy, MD, Carl Koenigsmann, MD, Chun Lee, MD, Kathleen Mantaro, MD, Jon Miller, MD, John Morley, MD, Susan Mueller, MD, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, Kristin Salotti, NP. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17528300)Document filed by John Gradia, Michael Vattiato, Brian Bernard, Peter Allen, Derrick Williams, Wayne Stewart, Rashid Rahman, Hugh Knight, Terry Mathis, Sean Pritchett, Eddie Fields, Mark Daniels, Spencer Jackson, Harold Ortiz, Felipe Rivera-Cruz, Angel Hernandez, Shannon Dickinson, Aaron Dockery.(Agnew, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Jackson
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Stewart
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Allen
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Bernard
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Dickinson
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashid Rahman
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Hernandez
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Mathis
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Rivera-Cruz
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Fields
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Daniels
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Williams
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh Knight
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Dockery
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gradia
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Vattiato
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Ortiz
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Pritchett
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Mantaro, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Miller, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Koenigsmann, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane or John Doe, NP or PA #1 - #50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morley, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Bozer, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Dinello, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Braselman, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chun Lee, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ashong, NP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Acrish, NP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane or John Doe, MD #3 - # 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hammer, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Karandy, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Andola, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikhail Gusman, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Salotti, NP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Mueller, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: New York State Office of the Attorney General
Represented By: Yan Fu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?