Landis v. Fernandez
Plaintiff: Andres Fernandez
Defendant: Daniel S. Landis
Case Number: 1:2019cv08192
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct Civil Summons and Complaint. Document filed by Andres Fernandez. Return Date set for 12/2/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Amended Civil Complaint, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Motion)(Ronemus, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Louis t. Cornacchia dated October 30, 2019 re: Resignation from Deirdre Tobin & Associates. Document filed by Daniel S. Landis.(Cornacchia, Louis)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All Parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a magistrate judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than 2/5/2020. Depositions to be completed by 1/15/2020. All expert discovery shall be completed no later than 2/20/2020. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: 5-6 days. The next Case Management Conference is scheduled for 2/20/2020 at 11:40 a.m. (As further set forth in this Order.) Deposition due by 1/15/2020. Fact Discovery due by 2/5/2020. Expert Discovery due by 2/20/2020. Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 11:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/23/2019) (cf)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Analisa Torres: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/23/2019. (AH)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 21, 2019, is hereby ADJOURNED to October 23, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/17/2019) Initial Conference set for 10/23/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (ks)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initial conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Louis T. Cornacchia dated October 17, 2019. Document filed by Daniel S. Landis. Return Date set for 10/21/2019 at 12:40 PM.(Cornacchia, Louis)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Daniel S. Landis. (Cornacchia, Louis)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael B. Ronemus on behalf of Andres Fernandez. (Ronemus, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: On September 6, 2019, the Court ordered the parties to submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan by October 15, 2019. ECF No. 4. Those submissions are now overdue. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit their letter and case management plan by October 17, 2019. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/16/2019) (cf)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 12:40 PM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/6/2019) (cf)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/6/2019) (cf)
September 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Louis Thomas Cornacchia. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Daniel S. Landis. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
September 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Louis Thomas Cornacchia. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $275,000,000; County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; no dollar demand entered on civil cover sheet; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
September 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cornacchia, Louis)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 28239/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17538171).Document filed by Danniel S. Landis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Verified Answer, #3 Exhibit Police Report, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornacchia, Louis)
September 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Louis Thomas Cornacchia. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
September 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Louis Thomas Cornacchia to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 9/9/2019. (pne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landis v. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Fernandez
Represented By: Michael B. Ronemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel S. Landis
Represented By: Louis Thomas Cornacchia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?