Trotta-Heim v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Madelyn Trotta-Heim
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv08275
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Madelyn Trotta-Heim. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipt)(Binder, Charles)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth J. Kim on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Kim, Elizabeth)
September 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Charles E Binder. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Commissioner of Social Security. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (pne)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (pne)
September 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commissioner of Social Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Madelyn Trotta-Heim. (Binder, Charles)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Binder, Charles)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Social Security. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17547652)Document filed by Madelyn Trotta-Heim.(Binder, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trotta-Heim v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madelyn Trotta-Heim
Represented By: Charles E Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?