New York Marine And General Insurance Company v. Pacesetter National Corporation
Plaintiff: New York Marine And General Insurance Company
Defendant: PACESETTER NATIONAL CORPORATION aka PACESETTER ADJUSTMENT COMPANY, Pacesetter National Corporation and Pacesetter Adjustment Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv08305
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332t
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Phillip M. Manela on behalf of New York Marine And General Insurance Company. (Manela, Phillip)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Court for an initial pretrial conference in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Thursday, January 16, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF(S) MUST: (i) IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL ATTORNEYS IN THIS ACTION BY SERVING UPON EACH OF THEM COPIES OF THIS NOTICE AND THE COURTS INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES; AND (ii) SEND A COPY OF SUCH NOTICE TO CHAMBERS (without attachments). IF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF(S) IS UNAWARE OF THE IDENTITY OF COUNSEL FOR ANY OF THE PARTIES, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF(S) MUST IMMEDIATELY SEND COPIES OF THE NOTICE AND INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO THAT PARTY PERSONALLY. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Initial Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/1/2019) (mml)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ProSight Global, Inc. for New York Marine And General Insurance Company. Document filed by New York Marine And General Insurance Company.(Lipsius, Ira)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pacesetter National Corporation. (jgo)
September 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ira S. Lipsius. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York Marine And General Insurance Company; Pacesetter National Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; alias was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
September 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ira S. Lipsius. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 110 (Insurance); Citizenship Plaintiff code 1 (Citizen of This State); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Jury Demand code p (Plaintiff); Dollar Demand $200000000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 190 (Contract: Other); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Jury Demand code has been modified to n (None); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $200000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PACESETTER NATIONAL CORPORATION aka PACESETTER ADJUSTMENT COMPANY, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by New York Marine And General Insurance Company. (Lipsius, Ira)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lipsius, Ira)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PACESETTER NATIONAL CORPORATION aka PACESETTER ADJUSTMENT COMPANY. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17553462)Document filed by New York Marine And General Insurance Company.(Lipsius, Ira)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Marine And General Insurance Company v. Pacesetter National Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Marine And General Insurance Company
Represented By: Ira S. Lipsius
Represented By: Phillip M. Manela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACESETTER NATIONAL CORPORATION aka PACESETTER ADJUSTMENT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacesetter National Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacesetter Adjustment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?