Williams v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Wanda M. Williams
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv08311
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1407pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 3:19-cv-18834, filed on 10/09/2019. (sjo)
October 9, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (sjo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/8/2019) (sjo)
September 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brian Alan Goldstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
September 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brian Alan Goldstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1407; County code Onondaga;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the County code has been modified to Erie;. (jgo)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldstein, Brian) Modified on 9/9/2019 (jgo). Modified on 9/9/2019 (jgo).
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goldstein, Brian) Modified on 9/9/2019 (jgo).
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17554938)Document filed by Wanda M. Williams.(Goldstein, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda M. Williams
Represented By: Brian Alan Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?