Congregation Kneses Israel of Sea G v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: CONGREGATION KNESES ISRAEL OF SEA G
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv08319
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine and Nichido Fire Insurance Company, Ltd. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Group, David)
September 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney David A. Group to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
September 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David A. Group. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand None; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $600,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
September 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David A. Group. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Congregation Kneses Israel of Sea G. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
September 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine North America, Inc. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Group, David) Modified on 9/11/2019 (ldi).
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Group, David)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 652223/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17556220).Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Supreme Court Documents - Summons with Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration Sheet for Ins. Policy - NY Address, #3 Exhibit 3 - Signed Declaration of Client - John Kirby)(Group, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Congregation Kneses Israel of Sea G v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: David A. Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONGREGATION KNESES ISRAEL OF SEA G
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?