Hypebeast Hong Kong Limited v. Anand
Plaintiff: Hypebeast Hong Kong Limited
Defendant: Jonathan Anand
Case Number: 1:2019cv08338
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 10/03/2019 in a court action filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (nd)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Jonathan Anand. Document filed by Hypebeast Hong Kong Limited. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Distefano, Angelo)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/23/2019) (rro)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (dnh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jonathan Anand. (dnh)
September 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
September 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
September 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Angelo Trent Distefano. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Hypebeast Hong Kong Limited, Jonathan Anand. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Distefano, Angelo)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hypebeast Hong Kong Limited.(Distefano, Angelo)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Distefano, Angelo)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jonathan Anand, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hypebeast Hong Kong Limited. (Distefano, Angelo)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jonathan Anand. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17558184)Document filed by Hypebeast Hong Kong Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Distefano, Angelo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hypebeast Hong Kong Limited v. Anand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hypebeast Hong Kong Limited
Represented By: Angelo Trent Distefano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Anand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?