Seidman v. Authentic Brands Group LLC
Plaintiff: Helyane Seidman
Defendant: Authentic Brands Group LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv08343
Filed: September 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of John L. Krieger in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Authentic Brands Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Seidman Cases, #2 Exhibit B - Additional Cases)(Karadbil, Jenna)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Authentic Brands Group LLC. (Karadbil, Jenna)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Authentic Brands Group LLC.(Karadbil, Jenna)
October 30, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #8 MOTION for John L. Krieger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17855997. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California. We do not except this certificate from the state bar association.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John L. Krieger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17855997. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Authentic Brands Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Nevada, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of John L. Krieger in Support of Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, #4 Proposed Order)(Krieger, John) Modified on 10/30/2019 (bcu).
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Authentic Brands Group LLC.(Karadbil, Jenna)
October 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Authentic Brands Group LLC answer due 11/1/2019. (rro)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 10/3/2019) (rro)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Jenna F. Karadbil dated October 1, 2019. Document filed by Authentic Brands Group LLC.(Karadbil, Jenna)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jenna Fey Karadbil on behalf of Authentic Brands Group LLC. (Karadbil, Jenna)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Authentic Brands Group LLC. (dnh)
September 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
September 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
September 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
September 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
September 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard Liebowitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Helayne Seidman. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
September 8, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Authentic Brands Group LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Helayne Seidman. (Liebowitz, Richard)
September 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Authentic Brands Group LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17561023)Document filed by Helayne Seidman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seidman v. Authentic Brands Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Authentic Brands Group LLC
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Represented By: Jenna Fey Karadbil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helyane Seidman
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?