Bartlett v. Tribeca Lending Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Bartlett
Defendant: Tribeca Lending Corp., Franklin Mortgage Asset Trust 2009A and Franklin Credit Management Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv08374
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332fc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Mailed a copy of #2 Order of Dismissal, #3 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), Notice of Appeal Forms, to Gregory Bartlett 187-10 Ridgedale Street Queens, NY 11413. (vba)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that under the January 29, 2016 order in Bartlett v. Tribeca Lending Corp., ECF 1:15-CV-6102, 11 (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 29, 2016), the Court dismisses the complaint without prejudice. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/21/2019) (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Appeal Package) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 21, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1651: On January 29, 2016, Plaintiff was barred from filing any new action in forma pauperis (IFP) without first obtaining from the Court leave to file. See Bartlett v. Tribeca Lending Corp., ECF 1:15-CV-6102, 11 (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 16, 2016). Plaintiff files this new pro se case, but has not submitted an application to proceed IFP and has not paid the relevant fees to bring this action. The Court construes Plaintiff's complaint as seeking IFP status, and notes that he has not sought leave from the Court. This action is therefore dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the January 29, 2016 order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this as a "written opinion" within the meaning of Section 205(a)(5) of the E-Government Act of 2002. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/21/2019) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
September 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Franklin Credit Management Corp., Franklin Mortgage Asset Trust 2009A, Tribeca Lending Corp. Document filed by Gregory Bartlett. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartlett v. Tribeca Lending Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tribeca Lending Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Mortgage Asset Trust 2009A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Credit Management Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?