Commissiong v. US Dept. Housing & Urban Development et al
Plaintiff: Carol Commissiong
Defendant: US Dept. Housing & Urban Development, JoAnn Frey, Jay Golden and Tang-Chi Yeh
Respondent: Jo-Ann Frey
Case Number: 1:2019cv08390
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Dismiss the Petition served on Carol Commissiong on November 8, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jo-Ann Frey, Jay Golden, US Dept. Housing & Urban Development, Tang-Chi Yeh. (Cowart, Brandon)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of to Pro Se Litigant Who Opposes a Rule 12 Motion Supported by Matters Outside the Pleadings re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by Jo-Ann Frey, Jay Golden, US Dept. Housing & Urban Development, Tang-Chi Yeh. (Cowart, Brandon)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Jo-Ann Frey, Jay Golden, US Dept. Housing & Urban Development, Tang-Chi Yeh. (Cowart, Brandon)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Jo-Ann Frey, Jay Golden, US Dept. Housing & Urban Development, Tang-Chi Yeh.(Cowart, Brandon)
October 28, 2019 Mailed a copy of #8 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, to Carol Commissiong 555 Main Street Apt. 1302 New York, NY 10044. (vba)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #4 Motion; granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for this action to be remanded to state court or that the action be accelerated is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant' request for an extension of time to respond to the petition until November 11, 2019 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at Documents 4 and 7, and to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/28/2019) (rro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Brandon Cowart dated October 16, 2019. Document filed by Jo-Ann Frey, Jay Golden, US Dept. Housing & Urban Development, Tang-Chi Yeh.(Cowart, Brandon)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Carol Commissiong on October 11, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jo-Ann Frey, Jay Golden, US Dept. Housing & Urban Development, Tang-Chi Yeh. (Cowart, Brandon)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Carol Commissiong IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' REMOVAL OF CASE #101204/2019(N.Y.S. Supreme Court) & PENALTY OF PERJURY; re: #1 Notice of Removal. Document filed by Carol Commissiong. (sc)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MOTION; re: for an order to speed up the process with a definite date, or send back to State Suprememe Court. Document filed by Carol Commissiong.(sc)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 UNSIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Carol Commissiong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sc)
September 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Carol Commissiong, US Dept. Housing & Urban Development, Jay Golden, Jo-Ann Frey, Tang-Chi Yeh. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (pne)
September 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cowart, Brandon)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 101204-2019..Document filed by JoAnn Frey, Jay Golden, US Dept. Housing & Urban Development, Tang-Chi Yeh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Cowart, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commissiong v. US Dept. Housing & Urban Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Dept. Housing & Urban Development
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoAnn Frey
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Golden
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tang-Chi Yeh
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Commissiong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jo-Ann Frey
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?