Duran v. Terrero
Plaintiff: Michelle Duran
Defendant: Johnny Terrero
Case Number: 1:2019cv08394
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441pi
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Michelle Duran (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Kenny, Richard)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard M. Kenny on behalf of Michelle Duran. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Kenny, Richard)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Johnny Terrero.(Zefi, Amanda)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/1/2019) (jca)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zefi, Amanda)
September 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Amanda Maria Zefi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Michelle Duran; Johnny Terrero. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Amanda Maria Zefi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1441; County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the County code has been modified to Westchester;. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Amanda Maria Zefi to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was uploaded incorrectly; Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 27532/2019E..Document filed by Johnny Terrero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint)(Zefi, Amanda)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zefi, Amanda) Modified on 9/12/2019 (jgo).
September 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Amanda Maria Zefi. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
September 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Amanda Maria Zefi to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Petition (Other). The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. the PDF must be titled Petition for Removal in which the party roles on the PDF case caption must be Petitioner v. Respondent OR be titled Notice of Removal in which the party roles on the PDF case caption must be Plaintiff v. Defendant; the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits must be filed as attachments to pleading and labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 9/16/2019. (jgo)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PETITION REMOVAL. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17574042).Document filed by Johnny Terrero.(Zefi, Amanda) Modified on 9/11/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran v. Terrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Terrero
Represented By: Amanda Maria Zefi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?