Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development v. Estate of Mary Fleming et al
Plaintiff: THE SECRETARY OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, an agency of the UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, and Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Defendant: New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, The Estate of Mary Fleming aka Mary E. Fleming aka Mary Elizabeth Fleming aka Mary Elizabeth Terry Fleming, deceased, New York City Department of Finance Parking Violations Bureau, New York City Environmental Control Board, United States of America o/b/o Internal Revenue Service, JOHN DOE #1-5 and JANE DOE #1-5,, Unknown Heirs of the Estate of Mary Fleming aka Mary E. Fleming aka Mary Elizabeth Fleming aka Mary Elizabeth Terry Fleming, Estate of Mary Fleming, Unknown Heirs of the Estate of Mary Fleming, Mary Elizabeth Terry Fleming, Mary E. Fleming, "John Doe #1-5" and "Jane Doe #1-5", United States Of America and Mary Elizabeth Fleming
Case Number: 1:2019cv08413
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345db
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/10/2019) (rro)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT BY PUBLICATION denying #6 Motion for Service by Publication. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mark the motion at Docket Number 6 DENIED and to remove it from the Court's list of pending motions. This constitutes a "written opinion" and order of the court. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/30/2019) (mml)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Manfredi, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST MOTION for Service by Publication . Document filed by Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 declaration, #2 Affirmation of Due Dilgence, #3 exhibit a, #4 proposed order of publication)(Manfredi, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against "John Doe #1-5" and "Jane Doe #1-5", Estate of Mary Fleming, New York City Department of Finance Parking Violations Bureau, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, United States Of America, Unknown Heirs of the Estate of Mary Fleming. Document filed by Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 exhibit a, #2 exhibit b, #3 exhibit c, #4 exhibit d, #5 exhibit e, #6 exhibit f, #7 exhibit g)(Manfredi, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to "John Doe #1-5" and "Jane Doe #1-5", Estate of Mary Fleming, New York City Department of Finance Parking Violations Bureau, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, United States Of America, Unknown Heirs of the Estate of Mary Fleming. (dnh)
September 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
September 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
September 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Stephen Manfredi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Dollar Demand left blank; County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 1 (U.S. Government Plaintiff); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $446,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
September 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John Stephen Manfredi to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the docket entry must reflect each of the party names as to whom the complaint is being filed against. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
September 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Stephen Manfredi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Estate of Mary Fleming aka Mary E. Fleming aka Mary Elizabeth Fleming aka Mary Elizabeth Terry Fleming, deceased, Unknown Heirs of the Estate of Mary Fleming aka Mary E. Fleming aka Mary Elizabeth Fleming aka Mary Elizabeth Terry Fleming, United States of America o/b/o Internal Revenue Service, JOHN DOE #1-5 and JANE DOE #1-5, THE SECRETARY OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, an agency of the UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Estate of Mary Fleming aka Mary E. Fleming aka Mary Elizabeth Fleming aka Mary Elizabeth Terry Fleming, deceased; Unknown Heirs of the Estate of Mary Fleming aka Mary E. Fleming aka Mary Elizabeth Fleming aka Mary Elizabeth Terry Fleming; United States of America o/b/o Internal Revenue Service; New York State Department of Taxation and Finance; New York City Environmental Control Board; New York City Department of Finance Parking Violations Bureau; JOHN DOE #1-5 and JANE DOE #1-5, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by THE SECRETARY OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, an agency of the UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Manfredi, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Manfredi, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by THE SECRETARY OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, an agency of the UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attachments: #1 exhibit a, #2 exhibit b, #3 exhibit c, #4 exhibit d, #5 exhibit e, #6 exhibit f, #7 exhibit g)(Manfredi, John) Modified on 9/11/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development v. Estate of Mary Fleming et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Taxation and Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Mary Fleming aka Mary E. Fleming aka Mary Elizabeth Fleming aka Mary Elizabeth Terry Fleming, deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Finance Parking Violations Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Environmental Control Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America o/b/o Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1-5 and JANE DOE #1-5,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of the Estate of Mary Fleming aka Mary E. Fleming aka Mary Elizabeth Fleming aka Mary Elizabeth Terry Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Mary Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of the Estate of Mary Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Elizabeth Terry Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary E. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "John Doe #1-5" and "Jane Doe #1-5"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Elizabeth Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE SECRETARY OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, an agency of the UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Represented By: John Stephen Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: John Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?