Benson Mills, Inc. v. Occasions Inc
Plaintiff: Benson Mills, Inc.
Defendant: Occasions Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv08421
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Granted. (Occasions Inc answer due 12/3/2019) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/4/2019) (jwh)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Robert Garson dated 11/4/19. Document filed by Occasions Inc.(Garson, Robert)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #9 Complaint. Granted. SO ORDERED. Occasions Inc answer due 11/4/2019. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/2/2019) (jca)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #9 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Robert Garson dated October 1, 2019. Document filed by Occasions Inc.(Garson, Robert)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Occasions Inc served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. Service was accepted by Ruben Ruda/Owner. Document filed by Benson Mills, Inc.. (Ewing, Bruce)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert David Garson on behalf of Occasions Inc. (Garson, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (jgo)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for additional pleading submitted to court for review.(Ewing, Bruce)
September 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Bruce Roy Millar Ewing Document No. #7 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):. the file date on the PDF is incorrect.. (jgo)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against Occasions Inc. Document filed by Benson Mills, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Ewing, Bruce)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document: Granted. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/12/2019) (jwh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for additional pleading submitted to court for review.(Ewing, Bruce) Modified on 9/13/2019 (jgo).
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File the complaint with exhibits addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Bruce R. Ewing dated September 12, 2019. Document filed by Benson Mills, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits)(Ewing, Bruce)
September 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Bruce Roy Millar Ewing to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Occasions Inc. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Occasions Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Benson Mills, Inc.. (Ewing, Bruce)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Benson Mills, Inc..(Ewing, Bruce)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ewing, Bruce)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Occasions Inc. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-17579218)Document filed by Benson Mills, Inc..(Ewing, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson Mills, Inc. v. Occasions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benson Mills, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Roy Millar Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occasions Inc
Represented By: Robert David Garson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?