Causi v. Slam Media Inc.
Plaintiff: Anthony Causi
Defendant: Slam Media Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv08471
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8 Letter filed by Slam Media Inc. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Slam Media Inc. answer due 11/19/2019.) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/4/2019) (rro)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Tatyana Voloshchuk dated November 4, 2019 re: extension of time to answer the complaint. Document filed by Slam Media Inc..(Voloshchuk, Tatyana)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. So Ordered. (Slam Media Inc. answer due 11/4/2019.) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 10/3/2019) (rro)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Tatyana Voloshchuk dated October 2, 2019. Document filed by Slam Media Inc..(Voloshchuk, Tatyana)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tatyana Voloshchuk on behalf of Slam Media Inc.. (Voloshchuk, Tatyana)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Slam Media Inc.. (dnh)
September 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
September 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
September 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
September 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Slam Media Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anthony Causi. (Liebowitz, Richard)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Slam Media Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17585425)Document filed by Anthony Causi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Causi v. Slam Media Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Causi
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slam Media Inc.
Represented By: Tatyana Voloshchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?