Coppelson et al v. Serhant et al
Plaintiff: AARON COPPELSON and NIGHTENGALE NY1, LLC
Defendant: Wells Fargo Advisors LLC, RYAN SERHANT, NEST SEEKERS INTERNATIONAL LLC, ELAD RAHAMIM, Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC and Elad Rahamin
Case Number: 1:2019cv08481
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pursuant to Rule IV.A of Your Honor's Individual Rules of Practices addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Sandra D. Grannum dated November 8, 2019. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC.(Grannum, Sandra)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SECOND STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE MOVE WITH RESPECT TO THE COMPLAINT: NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiffs and Wells Fargo Advisors, that the time for Wells Fargo Advisors to answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint is extended up to and including November 8, 2019., Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC answer due 11/8/2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/29/2019) (jca)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Grannum, Sandra)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Nest Seekers International LLC, Ryan Serhant.(Smith, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #13 Answer) - ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Nest Seekers International LLC, Ryan Serhant.(Smith, Michael) Modified on 10/11/2019 (db).
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucas Michelen on behalf of Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Michelen, Lucas)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marsha Jessica Indych on behalf of Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Indych, Marsha)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sandra Dawn Grannum on behalf of Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Grannum, Sandra)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Co. for Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC.(Grannum, Sandra)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. (Grannum, Sandra)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the respective undersigned counsel, that the time for Defendants Ryan Serhant and Nest Seekers International, LLC to move or answer is extended to October 10, 2019, opposition papers due on November 22, 2019 and reply papers due on December 6, 2019. Defendants Ryan Serhant and Nest Seekers International LLC hereby waive the affirmative defense of lack of personal jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. Nest Seekers International LLC answer due 10/10/2019; Ryan Serhant answer due 10/10/2019.( Motions due by 10/10/2019., Responses due by 11/22/2019, Replies due by 12/6/2019.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/19/2019) (rj)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Nest Seekers International LLC, Ryan Serhant. (Smith, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/16/2019) (jca)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Smith, Michael)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 156903/2019..Document filed by Nest Seekers International LLC, Ryan Serhant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons with Notice and Verified Complaint)(Smith, Michael)
September 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Howard Smith. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Aaron Coppelson; Nightengale NY1, LLC; Ryan Serhant; Nest Seekers International LLC; Elad Rahamin; Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
September 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michael Howard Smith. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
September 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael Howard Smith to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected for the pleading; the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney; pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits must be labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPREME, County of NEW YORK. Case Number: 156903/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17587769).Document filed by NEST SEEKERS INTERNATIONAL LLC, RYAN SERHANT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Michael) Modified on 9/13/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coppelson et al v. Serhant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Advisors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN SERHANT
Represented By: Michael Howard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEST SEEKERS INTERNATIONAL LLC
Represented By: Michael Howard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELAD RAHAMIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Marsha Jessica Indych
Represented By: Sandra Dawn Grannum
Represented By: Lucas Michelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elad Rahamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON COPPELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIGHTENGALE NY1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?