National Railroad Passenger Corporation v. City of New York
Plaintiff: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Defendant: The City of New York and City of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv08597
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:2201dj
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: City of New York answer due 4/10/2020. (jca)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/7/2020) (jca)
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from John R. Casolaro dated December 23, 2019. Document filed by City of New York.(Casolaro, John)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter, filed by City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (City of New York answer due 1/10/2020.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/22/2019) (jwh)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Michael H. Bauscher dated November 21, 2019 re: Requesting an extension of time for the City of New York to respond to Plaintiff's complaint from November 25, 2019 to January 10, 2020. Document filed by City of New York.(Bauscher, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter, filed by City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (City of New York answer due 11/25/2019.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/7/2019) (jwh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Michael H. Bauscher dated October 4, 2019 re: Requesting an extension of time for the City of New York to respond to Plainiff's complaint from October 11, 2019 to November 25, 2019. Document filed by City of New York.(Bauscher, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Helmut Bauscher on behalf of City of New York. (Bauscher, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Allen Ohliger on behalf of City of New York. (Ohliger, Lee)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Robert Casolaro on behalf of City of New York. (Casolaro, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. City of New York served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Legal Clerk. Document filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Ballaine, William)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Ashley Cohen on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Cohen, Jennifer)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edumin Corrales on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Corrales, Edumin)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/17/2019) (jwh)
September 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William G. Ballaine. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Washington. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York. (pne)
September 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Ballaine, William)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against The City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17609020)Document filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Ballaine, William)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ballaine, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Railroad Passenger Corporation v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: John Robert Casolaro
Represented By: Michael Helmut Bauscher
Represented By: Lee Allen Ohliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: William G. Ballaine
Represented By: Jennifer Ashley Cohen
Represented By: Edumin Corrales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?