Magestro v. Perrigo New York Inc.
Plaintiff: Paul J. Magestro
Defendant: Perrigo New York Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv08620
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Referring Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/13/2019) (rj)
November 11, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Perrigo New York Inc..(Horowitz, John)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Perrigo Company PLC for Perrigo New York Inc.. Document filed by Perrigo New York Inc..(Horowitz, John)
November 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney John David Horowitz to RE-FILE Document #7 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (ldi)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Perrigo New York Inc..(Horowitz, John) Modified on 11/7/2019 (ldi).
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Perrigo New York Inc. waiver sent on 9/20/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. Document filed by Perrigo New York Inc.. (Horowitz, John)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John David Horowitz on behalf of Perrigo New York Inc.. (Horowitz, John)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Paul J. Magestro consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Paul J. Magestro.(rdz)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (rdz)
September 17, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Perrigo New York Inc.. (rdz)
September 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (rdz) Modified on 9/18/2019 (rdz).
September 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Perrigo New York Inc.. (Filing Fee $ $400.00, Receipt Number 465401244087) Document filed by Paul J. Magestro.(rdz) Modified on 9/18/2019 (rdz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magestro v. Perrigo New York Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo New York Inc.
Represented By: John David Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul J. Magestro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?