Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Meza et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Nicholas Cascio, Futures Group IT LLC, Deogene Meza, Melody Meza, Futures Group Staffing Solutions, Inc., Futures Group Holdings Inc. and Eric Rosenthal
Case Number: 1:2019cv08658
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201dj
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (laq)
September 26, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eric Rosenthal. (pc)
September 26, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nicholas Cascio. (pc)
September 25, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nicholas Cascio, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Kennell, Patrick)
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eric Rosenthal, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Kennell, Patrick)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Futures Group Holdings Inc.. (dnh)
September 22, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FUTURES GROUP HOLDINGS INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Kennell, Patrick)
September 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Patrick Michael Kennell to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Docket entry error, the party as to whom the summons is for is incorrect. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Futures Group Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Futures Group IT LLC. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Melody Meza. (sj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deogene Meza. (sj)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FUTURES GROUP STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Kennell, Patrick)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UTURES GROUP HOLDINGS INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Kennell, Patrick) Modified on 9/20/2019 (sj).
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE FUTURES GROUP IT LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Kennell, Patrick)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Melody Meza, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Kennell, Patrick)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Deogene Meza, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Kennell, Patrick)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine and Nichido Fire Insurance Company, Ltd. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Kennell, Patrick)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on December 12, 2019, at 2:45 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference.The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/19/19) (yv) Modified on 9/20/2019 (yv).
September 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Patrick Michael Kennell. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Patrick Michael Kennell. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: NICHOLAS CASCIO, FUTURES GROUP STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC., Futures Group Holdings Inc., DEOGENE MEZA, MELODY MEZA, ERIC ROSENTHAL, The Futures Group IT LLC, PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kennell, Patrick)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NICHOLAS CASCIO, FUTURES GROUP STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC., Futures Group Holdings Inc., DEOGENE MEZA, MELODY MEZA, ERIC ROSENTHAL, The Futures Group IT LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17617709)Document filed by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A (Underlying Complaint), #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B (Policy))(Kennell, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Meza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Cascio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Futures Group IT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deogene Meza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody Meza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Futures Group Staffing Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Futures Group Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Michael Kennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?