Sanzari v. Metro-North Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Ralph Sanzari
Defendant: Metro-North Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv08689
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/2/2019) (jca)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metro-North Railroad Company. (pne)
September 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Meredith Morgan on behalf of Ralph Sanzari. (Morgan, Katherine)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carol Giuliano Dell on behalf of Ralph Sanzari. (Dell, Carol)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metro-North Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ralph Sanzari. (Dell, Carol)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ralph Sanzari.(Dell, Carol)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dell, Carol)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro-North Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17624044)Document filed by Ralph Sanzari.(Dell, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanzari v. Metro-North Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Sanzari
Represented By: Katherine Meredith Morgan
Represented By: Carol Giuliano Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?