Great Northern Insurance Company v. Cohen
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies and Great Northern Insurance Company
Defendant: David Cohen
Case Number: 1:2019cv08700
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201dj
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. David Cohen served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. Service was accepted by David Cohen. Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Wise, Tamar)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/20/2019) (ne)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Cohen. (jgo)
September 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Tamar Schwartz Wise. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Great Northern Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
September 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Tamar Schwartz Wise. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Cohen, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies. (Wise, Tamar)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Federal Insurance Company for Great Northern Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies. Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies.(Wise, Tamar)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wise, Tamar)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Cohen. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17626923)Document filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies.(Wise, Tamar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Northern Insurance Company v. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Chubb Group Of Insurance Companies
Represented By: Tamar Schwartz Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Tamar Schwartz Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?