Antolini v. McCloskey et al
Plaintiff: Dino Antolini
Defendant: Dimur Enterprises Inc., Eddie C K Chung, C&S Millenium Real Estate LLC, Theresa Laurent and Amy McCloskey
Case Number: 1:2019cv09038
Filed: September 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331cr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. C&S Millenium Real Estate LLC served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. Service was accepted by Eddie Chung. Document filed by Dino Antolini. (Finkelstein, Stuart)
October 26, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Eddie C K Chung served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019; Dimur Enterprises Inc. served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019; Theresa Laurent served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019; Amy McCloskey served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. Service was accepted by Ify Ezedinma,Grandy Chung. Document filed by Dino Antolini. (Finkelstein, Stuart)
October 25, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #16 Counterclaim. Document filed by Dino Antolini.(Finkelstein, Stuart)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Dino Antolini. Document filed by Dimur Enterprises Inc., Theresa Laurent, Amy McCloskey.(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Levin-Epstein on behalf of Dimur Enterprises Inc., Theresa Laurent, Amy McCloskey. (Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eunon Jason Mizrahi on behalf of Dimur Enterprises Inc., Theresa Laurent, Amy McCloskey. (Mizrahi, Eunon)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/2/2019) (jwh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C&S Millenium Real Estate LLC. (dnh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eddie C K Chung. (dnh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dimur Enterprises Inc.. (dnh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Theresa Laurent. (dnh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amy McCloskey. (dnh)
September 30, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 30, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
September 30, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
September 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stuart H. Finkelstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: C&S MILLENIUM REAL ESTATE LLC, DIMUR ENTERPRISES INC., Amy MCCLOSKEY. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (dnh)
September 28, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to C & S Millenium Real Estate LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dino Antolini. (Finkelstein, Stuart)
September 28, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eddie C K Chung, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dino Antolini. (Finkelstein, Stuart)
September 28, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dimur Enterprises Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dino Antolini. (Finkelstein, Stuart)
September 28, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Theresa Laurent, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dino Antolini. (Finkelstein, Stuart)
September 28, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amy Mccloskey, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dino Antolini. (Finkelstein, Stuart)
September 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Finkelstein, Stuart)
September 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C&S MILLENIUM REAL ESTATE LLC, Eddie C K Chung, DIMUR ENTERPRISES INC., Theresa Laurent, Amy MCCLOSKEY. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17682145)Document filed by Dino Antolini.(Finkelstein, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antolini v. McCloskey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimur Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Levin-Epstein
Represented By: Eunon Jason Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie C K Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&S Millenium Real Estate LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Laurent
Represented By: Joshua Levin-Epstein
Represented By: Eunon Jason Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy McCloskey
Represented By: Joshua Levin-Epstein
Represented By: Eunon Jason Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dino Antolini
Represented By: Stuart H. Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?