Ramchandani v. CitiBank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Rohan Ramchandani
Defendant: CitiGroup Inc., Citicorp and CitiBank National Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv09124
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Mr. Fishman from David R. Lurie dated 11/20/2019 re: We write in response to your letter dated November 11, 2019. Contrary to Citi's assertions, Ramchandani's allegations, many of which are drawn directly from statements by the DOJ and Citi itself, amply state a claim for malicious prosecution under New York law. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the letter above from Plaintiff in the public docket of this action. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/25/2019) (js)
November 15, 2019 Filing 20 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from David R. Lurie dated 11/14/19 re: This firm is co-counsel to Rohan Ramchandani, Plaintiff in the above-captioned action. On November 11, 2019, Defendants' counsel submitted a letter reciting arguments Defendants assert merit the dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint, pursuant to Section II.B.1 of this Court's Individual practices. With the permission of opposing counsel, and due to the limited availability of our client during this week, we request the Court's permission to respond to the foregoing letter on or before November 20, 2019. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The time for plaintiff to respond to the defendant's letter dated 11-11-19 is extended to 11-20-19. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/15/2019) (mro)
November 15, 2019 Filing 19 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Mr. Lurie from Marshall H. Fishman dated 11/11/19 re: Counsel requests that you voluntarily dismiss the action, with prejudice, to avoid unnecessary motion practice. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by defendant. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/15/2019) (mro)
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc. for Citicorp; Corporate Parent Citicorp LLC, Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc. for CitiBank National Association. Document filed by CitiBank National Association, CitiGroup Inc., Citicorp.(Fishman, Marshall)
October 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Marshall Howard Fishman to RE-FILE Document #16 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 COMPLAINT against CitiBank National Association, CitiGroup Inc., Citicorp. Document filed by Rohan Ramchandani.(Lurie, David)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CitiBank National Association, CitiGroup Inc., Citicorp.(Fishman, Marshall) Modified on 10/28/2019 (ldi).
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Eaton Hoyle on behalf of CitiBank National Association, CitiGroup Inc., Citicorp. (Hoyle, Lindsay)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Joseph Rubin on behalf of CitiBank National Association, CitiGroup Inc., Citicorp. (Rubin, Samuel)
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marshall Howard Fishman on behalf of CitiBank National Association, CitiGroup Inc., Citicorp. (Fishman, Marshall)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Citicorp waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Document filed by Rohan Ramchandani. (Lurie, David)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. CitiBank National Association waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Document filed by Rohan Ramchandani. (Lurie, David)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. CitiGroup Inc. waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Document filed by Rohan Ramchandani. (Lurie, David)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CitiBank National Association. (pne)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Citibank National Association, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rohan Ramchandani. (Lurie, David)
October 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Rudolph Lurie to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): List the party's full name on the docket entry for the summons, do not use acronyms. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Citicorp. (pc)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CitiGroup Inc.. (pc)
October 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
October 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
October 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David Rudolph Lurie to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
October 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Rudolph Lurie. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $112,000,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Citicorp, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rohan Ramchandani. (Lurie, David)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Citigroup, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rohan Ramchandani. (Lurie, David)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Citbank, NA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rohan Ramchandani. (Lurie, David) Modified on 10/3/2019 (pc).
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lurie, David)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17699778)Document filed by Rohan Ramchandani.(Lurie, David) Modified on 10/3/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramchandani v. CitiBank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rohan Ramchandani
Represented By: David Rudolph Lurie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiGroup Inc.
Represented By: Marshall Howard Fishman
Represented By: Samuel Joseph Rubin
Represented By: Lindsay Eaton Hoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citicorp
Represented By: Marshall Howard Fishman
Represented By: Samuel Joseph Rubin
Represented By: Lindsay Eaton Hoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiBank National Association
Represented By: Marshall Howard Fishman
Represented By: Samuel Joseph Rubin
Represented By: Lindsay Eaton Hoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?