Greater New York Insurance Company v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Greater New York Insurance Company
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv09137
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is not to be tried to a jury. Depositions due by 1/24/2020. Expert Deposition due by 4/20/2020. Fact Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Expert Discovery due by 4/20/2020. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 3 days. Status letter due 3/6/20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/8/2019) (ks)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. The parties have conferred and request that the settlement conference be scheduled on or before January 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/8/2019) (rjm)
November 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/8/2019. Status letter due by 3/6/2019. (bh)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Greater New York Insurance Company. (Messier, Jonathan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Marci Goldstein Kokalas dated October 30, 2019 re: Greater New York Mutual Ins. Co. v. Philadelphia Indemnity Ins. Co.. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Kokalas, Marci)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on November 8, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. The conference will be held in Courtroom 706 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Court House, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Counsel who appear at the pretrial conference must be authorized to negotiate terms of settlement.So Ordered. Initial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 706, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/9/2019) (js)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Kokalas, Marci)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Greater New York Insurance Company.(Messier, Jonathan)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Anthony Messier on behalf of Greater New York Insurance Company. (Messier, Jonathan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Copy of Judge Oetken Oct. 3 Order served on Jonathan Messier, Esq. on October 4, 2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Kokalas, Marci)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This case was removed from New York Supreme Court, New York County, on October 2, 2019. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to file an appearance with this Court no later than October 24, 2019. Counsel for the defendant shall serve a copy of this order on counsel for the plaintiff by October 17, 2019. SO ORDERED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/3/2019) (js)
October 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
October 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine and Nichido Fire Insurance Company, Ltd. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Kokalas, Marci)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kokalas, Marci)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 654889/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17700887).Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Affidavit Rule 7.1 Disclosure)(Kokalas, Marci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greater New York Insurance Company v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Marci Goldstein Kokalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater New York Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Anthony Messier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?