Hewes v. Alabama Secretary of State et al
Plaintiff: Henry F. Hewes
Defendant: Iowa Secretary of State, Connecticut Secretary of State, Florida Secretary of State, Illinois Secretary of State, District of Columbia Consumer & Regulatory Affairs, Virginia Secretary of State, Pennsylvania Secretary of State, Delaware Secretary of State, Missouri Corporations Division, Utah Department of Commerce, Arkansas Secretary of State, Tennessee Secretary of State, Minnesota Secretary of State, Texas Secretary of State, Ohio Secretary of State, Wyoming Secretary of State, Vermont Secretary of State, Louisiana Secretary of State, South Dekota Secretary of State, Massachusetts Secretary of State, Arizona Corporation Commission, New York Department of State, Idaho Secretary of State, North Carolina Secretary of State, Mississippi Secretary of State, Michigan Secretary of State, New Jersey Division of Revenue, California Secretary of State, West Virginia Secretary of State, Maryland Secretary of State, Indiana Secretary of State, Colorado Secretary of State, New Mexico Corporations Division, Washington Secretary of State, Rhode Island Secretary of State, Oklahoma Secretary of State, South Carolina Secretary of State, Georgia Secretary of State, Montana Secretary of State, Maine State Department, Nebraska Secretary of State, Alabama Secretary of State, Wisconsin Secretary of State and Oregon Secretary of State
Case Number: 1:2019cv09158
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 35 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Henry Hewes, dated 11/21/19 re: Plaintiff requests permission from the Court to submit an Order to Show Cause as to why the states should not be ordered to place his name on the various ballots until the case is finally adjudicated. Document filed by Henry F. Hewes.(sc)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Robert A. Berry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
November 25, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for Robert A. Berry to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18131822. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 22, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Robert A. Berry to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18131822. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Idaho Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Berry, Robert)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Sarah Hughes Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
November 19, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #31 MOTION for Sarah Hughes Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 19, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Sarah Hughes Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Illinois Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A, Affidavit of Sarah Hughes Newman, #2 Exhibit B, Certificate of Admission To the Bar of Illinois, #3 Text of Proposed Order C, Proposed Order)(Newman, Sarah)
November 19, 2019 Mailed a copy of #27 Order, Set Deadlines, to Henry F. Hewes 515 Madison Avenue Suite 22B New York, NY 10022. (vba)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Steven C. Kilpatrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
November 19, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #29 MOTION for Steven C. Kilpatrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18095381. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
November 19, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Steven C. Kilpatrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18095381. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Wisconsin Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Steven C. Kilpatrick In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Kilpatrick, Steven)
November 19, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ilona Kirshon on behalf of Delaware Secretary of State. (Kirshon, Ilona)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's prior Order at ECF No. 18 (and notwithstanding its later Order at ECF No. 25), a group of Defendants did, in fact, timely submitted a proposed briefing schedule for consolidated motions to dismiss. See ECF No. 23. Although not all Defendants consented to the proposal, no other proposals were submitted by the November 15, 2019 deadline. Accordingly, Defendants' proposed schedule is ADOPTED subject to the following modifications: All Defendants, including those who did not affirmatively consent to the proposal at ECF No. 23, shall file a single joint motion to dismiss raising common, potentially dispositive issues-including, but not limited to, the issues described in both the First and Second Rounds proposed by Defendants at ECF No. 23-by December 19, 2019. If the case remains unresolved following Defendants' joint motion to dismiss, the Court will set a briefing schedule for any further motions to dismiss thereafter. Defendants (including those who did not consent to the joint proposal) may not file a separate motion to dismiss absent leave of the Court obtained in advance through a letter-motion filed on ECF. If Defendants file a joint motion to dismiss, Plaintiff shall file any opposition by January 23, 2020. Defendants shall file a single joint reply by January 30, 2020. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. ( Motions due by 12/19/2019., Responses due by 1/23/2020, Replies due by 1/30/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/19/2019) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 19, 2019 Mailed a copy of #25 Order, to Henry F. Hewes 515 Madison Avenue Suite 22B New York, NY 10022. (vba)
November 19, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abigail Laura Fee on behalf of Massachusetts Secretary of State. (Fee, Abigail)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: On November 4, 2019, the Court ordered all Defendants that have been served as stated in ECF No. 4 to confer and submit a joint letter by November 15, 2019, proposing a briefing schedule for a consolidated motion to dismiss raising potentially dispositive issues common to multiple or all Defendants. See ECF No. 18. To date, no such joint letter has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file the required joint letter no later than Thursday, November 21, 2019. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/18/2019) (ks) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 15, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #24 MOTION for Sarah Hughes Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18072393. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Illinois;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 24 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Sarah Hughes Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18072393. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Illinois Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sarah Hughes Newman, #2 Exhibit B, Letter of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Newman, Sarah) Modified on 11/15/2019 (wb).
November 15, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Proposal for Responsive Motions re: #18 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,,,,. Document filed by South Carolina Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Smith, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from H. Hewes, re: Plaintiff writes to the Court that he opposes any extensions in this case but, if an an extension is granted, it should be for no longer than a week etc. Document filed by Henry F. Hewes.(sc)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for James Emory Smith, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
November 5, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for James Emory Smith, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17895902. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for James Emory Smith, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17895902. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by South Carolina Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Smith for PHV Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Smith, James)
November 5, 2019 Mailed a copy of #17 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #18 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, to Henry F. Hewes 515 Madison Avenue Suite 22B New York, NY 10022. (vba)
November 4, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Affidavit of Karl D. Smith, Certificate of Good Standing, Proposed Order, Notice of Appearance, and Letter-Motion for Extension of Time served on Henry F. Hewes on 11/04/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Washington Secretary of State. (Smith, Karl)
November 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Alabama Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Arizona Corporation Commission answer due 12/5/2019; Arkansas Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; California Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Colorado Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Connecticut Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Delaware Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; District of Columbia Consumer & Regulatory Affairs answer due 12/5/2019; Florida Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Georgia Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Idaho Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Illinois Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Indiana Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Iowa Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Louisiana Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Maine State Department answer due 12/5/2019; Maryland Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Massachusetts Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Michigan Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Minnesota Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Mississippi Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Missouri Corporations Division answer due 12/5/2019; Montana Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Nebraska Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; New Jersey Division of Revenue answer due 12/5/2019; New Mexico Corporations Division answer due 12/5/2019; North Carolina Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Ohio Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Oklahoma Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Oregon Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Pennsylvania Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Rhode Island Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; South Carolina Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; South Dekota Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Tennessee Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Texas Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Utah Department of Commerce answer due 12/5/2019; Vermont Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Virginia Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Washington Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; West Virginia Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Wisconsin Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019; Wyoming Secretary of State answer due 12/5/2019. (ama)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: denying #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Applications DENIED. As the primary basis for NYS DOS's anticipated motion seems to be failure to properly serve under New York law, it is not clear what is to be gained from awaiting the Court's resolution of that motion. And the Court is unpersuaded by the suggestion that filing for pro hac vice status in this District is unduly burdensome. The deadline for all Defendants that have been served as stated in ECF No. 4 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby EXTENDED to December 5, 2019. Such Defendants shall promptly confer and, no later than November 15, 2019, submit a proposal to the Court with respect to motion practice that would most efficiently adjudicate Plaintiff's claims - ideally, a single joint motion to dismiss on issues that are common to multiple or all Defendants and/or on issues that could be case dispositive (with another round of motion practice on issues that are unique to individual Defendants). If Defendants' proposal on that score warrants a further extension of the deadline to answer, they should so advise the Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 11 and to mail a copy of this endorsed letter to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/04/2019) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: New York Department of State answer due 12/5/2019. Motions due by 12/5/2019. (jwh)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Application GRANTED. NYS DOS's deadline to answer or move to dismiss is hereby EXTENDED to December 5, 2019. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 9 and to mail a copy of this endorsed letter to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/4/2019) (jwh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Karl D. Smith dated 11/04/2019. Document filed by Washington Secretary of State.(Smith, Karl)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karl D. Smith, I on behalf of Washington Secretary of State. (Smith, Karl)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Sean Michael Whelan dated November 4, 2019. Document filed by West Virginia Secretary of State.(Whelan, Sean)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Karl D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Sean Michael Whelan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
November 4, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Karl D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Alexander T. Korn dated 11/1/2019. Document filed by Pennsylvania Secretary of State.(Korn, Alexander)
November 1, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #10 MOTION for Karl D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17879982.(Smith, Karl)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Karl D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Washington Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Karl)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Roderick L. Arz dated November 1, 2019. Document filed by New York Department of State.(Arz, Roderick)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roderick Leopold Arz on behalf of New York Department of State. (Arz, Roderick)
November 1, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Sean Michael Whelan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17877222. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Sean Michael Whelan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17877222. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by West Virginia Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Sean Michael Whelan, #3 Exhibit Certification of Good Standing)(Whelan, Sean)
October 30, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #5 MOTION for Anne Marie Mackin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17862853.(Mackin, Anne)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Anne Marie Mackin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
October 30, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice re: Document No. #5 MOTION for Anne Marie Mackin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filing fee was not paid. Please call 212-805-0800 when the fee is paid. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (wb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Anne Marie Mackin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Texas Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Prop Order, #2 Affidavit Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mackin, Anne)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Alabama Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Arizona Corporation Commission served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; California Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Colorado Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Connecticut Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Delaware Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; District of Columbia Consumer & Regulatory Affairs served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Florida Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Georgia Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Idaho Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Illinois Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Indiana Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Iowa Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Louisiana Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Maine State Department served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Maryland Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Massachusetts Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Michigan Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Minnesota Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Mississippi Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Missouri Corporations Division served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Montana Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Nebraska Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; New Jersey Division of Revenue served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; New Mexico Corporations Division served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; New York Department of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; North Carolina Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Ohio Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Oklahoma Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Oregon Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Pennsylvania Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Rhode Island Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; South Carolina Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; South Dekota Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Tennessee Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Texas Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Utah Department of Commerce served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Vermont Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Virginia Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Washington Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; West Virginia Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Wisconsin Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Wyoming Secretary of State served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Henry F. Hewes. (sc)
October 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (rdz)
October 3, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alabama Secretary of State, Arizona Corporation Commission, Arkansas Secretary of State, California Secretary of State, Colorado Secretary of State, Connecticut Secretary of State, Delaware Secretary of State, District of Columbia Consumer & Regulatory Affairs, Florida Secretary of State, Georgia Secretary of State, Idaho Secretary of State, Illinois Secretary of State, Indiana Secretary of State, Iowa Secretary of State, Louisiana Secretary of State, Main State Department, Maryland Secretary of State, Massachusetts Secretary of State, Michigan Secretary of State, Minnesota Secretary of State, Mississippi Secretary of State, Missouri Corporations Division, Montana Secretary of State, Nebraska Secretary of State, New Jersey Division of Revenue, New Mexico Corporations Division, New York Department of State, North Carolina Secretary of State, Ohio Secretary of State, Oklahoma Secretary of State, Oregon Secretary of State, Pennsylvania Secretary of State, Rhode Island Secretary of State, South Carolina Secretary of State, South Dekota Secretary of State, Tennessee Secretary of State, Texas Secretary of State, Utah Department of Commerce, Vermont Secretary of State, Virginia Secretary of State, Washington Secretary of State. (rdz)
October 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Alabama Secretary of State, Arizona Corporation Commission, Arkansas Secretary of State, California Secretary of State, Colorado Secretary of State, Connecticut Secretary of State, Delaware Secretary of State, District of Columbia Consumer & Regulatory Affairs, Florida Secretary of State, Georgia Secretary of State, Idaho Secretary of State, Illinois Secretary of State, Indiana Secretary of State, Iowa Secretary of State, Louisiana Secretary of State, Maine State Department, Maryland Secretary of State, Massachusetts Secretary of State, Michigan Secretary of State, Minnesota Secretary of State, Mississippi Secretary of State, Missouri Corporations Division, Montana Secretary of State, Nebraska Secretary of State, New Jersey Division of Revenue, New Mexico Corporations Division, New York Department of State, North Carolina Secretary of State, Ohio Secretary of State, Oklahoma Secretary of State, Oregon Secretary of State, Pennsylvania Secretary of State, Rhode Island Secretary of State, South Carolina Secretary of State, South Dekota Secretary of State, Tennessee Secretary of State, Texas Secretary of State, Utah Department of Commerce, Vermont Secretary of State, Virginia Secretary of State, Washington Secretary of State, West Virginia Secretary of State, Wisconsin Secretary of State, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Filing Fee $ $400.00, Receipt Number 465401245464)Document filed by Henry F. Hewes.(rdz) Modified on 10/4/2019 (rdz).
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (rdz) Modified on 10/4/2019 (rdz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewes v. Alabama Secretary of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Secretary of State
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District of Columbia Consumer & Regulatory Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Secretary of State
Represented By: Alexander Thomas Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Secretary of State
Represented By: Ilona Kirshon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Corporations Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Department of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Secretary of State
Represented By: Anne Marie Mackin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermont Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Dekota Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Secretary of State
Represented By: Abigail Laura Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Corporation Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Department of State
Represented By: Roderick Leopold Arz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Secretary of State
Represented By: Robert Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Jersey Division of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Secretary of State
Represented By: Sean Michael Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Corporations Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Secretary of State
Represented By: Karl D. Smith, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhode Island Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Secretary of State
Represented By: James Emory Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maine State Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Secretary of State
Represented By: Steven Carl Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry F. Hewes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?