Young-Bryan v. TCPRNC LLC
Plaintiff: Lamoy Young-Bryan
Defendant: TCPRNC LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv09169
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/8/2019. (anc)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan is submitted by the parties in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3). All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). All Fact Discovery due by 2/21/2020. All Expert Discovery due by 3/31/2020. Deposition due by 3/31/2020. This case is to be tried to a jury. The next Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/08/2019) (ama)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yuval David Bar-kokhba on behalf of TCPRNC LLC. (Bar-kokhba, Yuval)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. TCPRNC LLC waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. Document filed by Lamoy Young-Bryan. (Filosa, Gregory)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Gregory N. Filosa, Esq. dated October 31, 2019 re: Status Letter for Initial Pre-Trial Conference. Document filed by Lamoy Young-Bryan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Filosa, Gregory)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/4/2019) (mro)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TCPRNC LLC. (dnh)
October 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 4, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gregory Nicholas Filosa. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: TCPRNC LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party type was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TCPRNC LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lamoy Young-Bryan. (Filosa, Gregory)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Filosa, Gregory)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TCPRNC LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17712538)Document filed by Lamoy Young-Bryan.(Filosa, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young-Bryan v. TCPRNC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamoy Young-Bryan
Represented By: Gregory Nicholas Filosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCPRNC LLC
Represented By: Yuval David Bar-kokhba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?