NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P. et al
Plaintiff: NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund
Defendant: AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv09171
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-18141885. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al.(Evans, Donna)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (23) Motion for Justin N. Boley to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Justin N. Boley is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (19) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-08712-CM; granting (20) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-08856-CM; granting (15) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09036-CM; granting (17) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM; granting (16) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09094-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (21) Motion for Tyler J. Story to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Tyler J. Story is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml)
November 8, 2019 CASE ASSOCIATED: Create association to 1:19-cv-08296-CM. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/08/2019) (NAP)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #21 Motion for Tyler William Hudson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS ORDERED that Tyler W. Hudson is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/29/2019) (mml)
October 28, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Tyler William Hudson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 28, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Tyler William Hudson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Hudson, Tyler)
October 21, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #20 MOTION for Tyler W. Hudson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Kansas. We do not except certificates from other district courts.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
October 21, 2019 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Tyler W. Hudson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudson, Tyler) Modified on 10/21/2019 (bcu).
October 21, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #17 MOTION for Tyler W. Hudson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17798135. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Missouri, Supreme Court of Kansas, District of Columbia. Proposed Order not attached.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (vba)
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund. Related Document Number: [#17]. (Hudson, Tyler) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tyler Hudson on behalf of NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund. (Hudson, Tyler)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Tyler W. Hudson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17798135. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund.(Hudson, Tyler) Modified on 10/21/2019 (vba).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties in the above-captioned matters are hereby instructed to appear for a conference on Friday, November 8, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. Status Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/17/2019) (mml)
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Thomas H. Burt dated Oct. 10, 2019 re: consolidation with No. 1:19-cv-08296-CM. Document filed by NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund.(Burt, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
October 4, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
October 4, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-08296-CM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (dnh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (dnh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AstraZeneca UK Limited. (dnh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AstraZeneca L.P.. (dnh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.. (dnh)
October 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas H. Burt. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
October 4, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 1:19-cv-08296-CM. (dnh)
October 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 4, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
October 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas H. Burt. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332 Diversity Action; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund.(Burt, Thomas)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-08296-CM. Document filed by NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund.(Burt, Thomas)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund. (Burt, Thomas)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund. (Burt, Thomas)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca UK Limited, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund. (Burt, Thomas)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca L.P., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund. (Burt, Thomas)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund. (Burt, Thomas)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Burt, Thomas)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17712894)Document filed by NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund.(Burt, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca UK Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Thomas H. Burt
Represented By: Tyler Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?