Solomon v. Saul
Plaintiff: Ryann Solomon
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv09198
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carol Santangelo on behalf of Ryann Solomon. (Santangelo, Carol)
October 11, 2019 Mailed a copy of #18 Scheduling Order, to U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York 86 Chambers Street Civil Division NY, NY 10007. (aea)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties should follow the schedule set forth in the Standing Order at ECF No. 8. Any stipulation entered between the parties including, but not limited to, a remand to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings, must be approved by the district judge, unless the parties consent to my jurisdiction over the case for all purposes. The parties shall advise the Court as to whether they jointly consent to decision of this action by this United States magistrate judge. The Clerk of Court is ordered to send this order to the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/11/2019) (ras) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul. (pc)
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul. (pc)
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul. (pc)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, Care of William Barr, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Ryann Solomon. (Arciniega, Violeta)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, Care of Geoffrey S. Berman, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Ryann Solomon. (Arciniega, Violeta)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Ryann Solomon. (Arciniega, Violeta)
October 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Violeta Arciniega to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Caption title is incomplete;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/7/2019) (jwh)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/7/2019) (jwh)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Motions referred to Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/8/2019) (jwh)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (jgo)
October 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Violeta Arciniega. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Andrew M. Saul. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
October 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Violeta Arciniega. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx;. (jgo)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew M. Saul Care of William Barr, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Ryann Solomon. (Arciniega, Violeta) Modified on 10/9/2019 (pc).
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew M. Saul Care of Geoffrey S. Berman, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Ryann Solomon. (Arciniega, Violeta) Modified on 10/9/2019 (pc).
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Ryann Solomon. (Arciniega, Violeta) Modified on 10/9/2019 (pc).
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Ryann Solomon.(Arciniega, Violeta)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis . Document filed by Ryann Solomon.(Arciniega, Violeta)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul. Document filed by Ryann Solomon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Arciniega, Violeta)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Arciniega, Violeta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solomon v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryann Solomon
Represented By: Violeta Arciniega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?