Scalia v. Ruane, Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Defendant: Gary D Forsee, Lowell L Bryan, DST Systems, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan, M Elizabeth Sweetman, Robert D Goldfarb, Gerard M Lavin, The Advisory Committee of the DST Systems, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan, DST Systems, Inc., George L Argyros, Kenneth V Hager, Jerome H Bailey, Randall D Young, Douglas W Tapp, Ruane, Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc., Brent L Law, Lawrence M Higby, Lynn Dorsey Bleil, Gregg W Givens, Samuel G Liss, The Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of DST Systems, Inc., Charles E Haldeman, Jr. and Travis E Reed
Case Number: 1:2019cv09302
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Referring Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #81 MOTION for Michael S. Hines to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18233321. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
December 6, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION for Michael S. Hines to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18233321. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Charles E Haldeman, Jr., Randall D Young. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael S. Hines, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hines, Michael)
December 6, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #80 MOTION for James R. Carroll to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18233142. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
December 6, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION for James R. Carroll to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18233142. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Charles E Haldeman, Jr., Randall D Young. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James R. Carroll, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, James)
December 6, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander C Drylewski on behalf of Charles E Haldeman, Jr., Randall D Young. (Drylewski, Alexander)
December 2, 2019 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Kenneth V Hager served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. Service was accepted by Kenneth V. Hager, Defendant. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Tai, Amy)
November 12, 2019 Filing 77 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Douglas W Tapp waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 76 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. M Elizabeth Sweetman waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 75 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Travis E Reed waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 74 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Samuel G Liss waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 73 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Brent L Law waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 72 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gerard M Lavin waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 71 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Lawrence M Higby waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 70 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gregg W Givens waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 69 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gary D Forsee waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 68 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. DST Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 67 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of DST Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 66 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Lowell L Bryan waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 65 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Lynn Dorsey Bleil waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 64 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jerome H Bailey waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 63 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. George L Argyros waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 62 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Advisory Committee of the DST Systems, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robert D Goldfarb waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ruane, Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc. waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Randall D Young waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Charles E Haldeman, Jr. waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 22, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Tai on behalf of Eugene Scalia. (Tai, Amy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Walter Olander on behalf of Robert D Goldfarb, Ruane, Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (Olander, Frank)
October 21, 2019 Filing 55 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ruane, Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc..(Ward, Robert)
October 21, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert J. Ward on behalf of Robert D Goldfarb, Ruane, Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (Ward, Robert)
October 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so redesignated. (wb)
October 21, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
October 21, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-06685-ALC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
October 18, 2019 Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Orly S. Godfrey dated October 18, 2019 re: DST Parties' Request for Transfer [Dkt. 52]. Document filed by Eugene Scalia.(Shoham, Orly)
October 17, 2019 Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Lewis R. Clayton dated October 17, 2019 re: Request for Transfer. Document filed by DST Systems, Inc., The Advisory Committee of the DST Systems, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan, The Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of DST Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ferguson Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Canfield Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Mendon Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Scalia Complaint)(Clayton, Lewis)
October 17, 2019 Filing 51 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent SS&C Technologies, Inc. for DST Systems, Inc.. Document filed by DST Systems, Inc..(Clayton, Lewis)
October 17, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua David Kaye on behalf of DST Systems, Inc., The Advisory Committee of the DST Systems, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan, The Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of DST Systems, Inc.. (Kaye, Joshua)
October 17, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey John Recher on behalf of DST Systems, Inc., The Advisory Committee of the DST Systems, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan, The Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of DST Systems, Inc.. (Recher, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lewis Richard Clayton on behalf of DST Systems, Inc., The Advisory Committee of the DST Systems, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan, The Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of DST Systems, Inc.. (Clayton, Lewis)
October 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #47 MOTION for Anna O. Area to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Anna O. Area to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration iso Motion, #2 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Area, Anna)
October 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #46 MOTION for Isidro Mariscal to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 10, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Isidro Mariscal to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mariscal, Isidro) Modified on 10/11/2019 (aea). Modified on 10/11/2019 (wb).
October 9, 2019 Filing 45 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Advisory Committee of the DST Systems, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 44 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to George L Argyros. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 43 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jerome H Bailey. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 42 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lynn Dorsey Bleil. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 41 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lowell L Bryan. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 40 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of DST Systems, Inc.. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 39 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DST Systems, Inc.. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gary D Forsee. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gregg W Givens. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert D Goldfarb. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenneth V Hager. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Charles E Haldeman, Jr.. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lawrence M Higby. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gerard M Lavin. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brent L Law. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samuel G Liss. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ruane, Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Travis E Reed. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to M Elizabeth Sweetman. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Douglas W Tapp. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Randall D Young. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 24 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Shoham, Orly)
October 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
October 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
October 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
October 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Orly Shoham to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil Cover Sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
October 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Orly Shoham. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Eugene Scalia. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
October 8, 2019 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Randall D. Young, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Douglas W. Tapp, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to M. Elizabeth Sweetman, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Travis E. Reed, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ruane, Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samuel G. Liss, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brent L. Law, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gerard M. Lavin, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lawrence M. Higby, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Charles E. Haldeman, Jr., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenneth V. Hager, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert D. Goldfarb, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gregg W. Givens, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gary D. Forsee, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DST Systems, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of DST Systems, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lowell L. Bryan, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lynn Dorsey Bleil, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jerome H. Bailey, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to George L. Argyros, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Advisory Committee of the DST Systems, Inc. 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Eugene Scalia. (Shoham, Orly)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Shoham, Orly) Modified on 10/9/2019 (sj).
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George L Argyros, Jerome H Bailey, Lynn Dorsey Bleil, Lowell L Bryan, DST Systems, Inc., DST Systems, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan, Gary D Forsee, Gregg W Givens, Robert D Goldfarb, Kenneth V Hager, Charles E Haldeman, Jr., Lawrence M Higby, Gerard M Lavin, Brent L Law, Samuel G Liss, Travis E Reed, Ruane, Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc., M Elizabeth Sweetman, Douglas W Tapp, The Advisory Committee of the DST Systems, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan, The Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of DST Systems, Inc., Randall D Young. Document filed by Eugene Scalia.(Shoham, Orly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia v. Ruane, Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary D Forsee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowell L Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DST Systems, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Elizabeth Sweetman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D Goldfarb
Represented By: Frank Walter Olander
Represented By: Robert J. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard M Lavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Advisory Committee of the DST Systems, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan
Represented By: Lewis Richard Clayton
Represented By: Jeffrey John Recher
Represented By: Joshua David Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DST Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Richard Clayton
Represented By: Jeffrey John Recher
Represented By: Joshua David Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George L Argyros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth V Hager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome H Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall D Young
Represented By: Michael S. Hines
Represented By: Alexander C Drylewski
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas W Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruane, Cunniff & Goldfarb, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Walter Olander
Represented By: Robert J. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent L Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence M Higby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Dorsey Bleil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg W Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel G Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Compensation Committee of the Board of Directors of DST Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Richard Clayton
Represented By: Jeffrey John Recher
Represented By: Joshua David Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E Haldeman, Jr.
Represented By: Michael S. Hines
Represented By: Alexander C Drylewski
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis E Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Orly Shoham
Represented By: Isidro Mariscal
Represented By: Anna Odella Area
Represented By: Amy Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?