Genger v. Genger et al
Petitioner: Orly Genger
Respondent: Dalia Genger, Sagi Genger 1993 Trust and Orly Genger 1993 Trust
Case Number: 1:2019cv09319
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judith Lisa Bachman on behalf of Dalia Genger. (Bachman, Judith)
November 12, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT MOTION to Remand to State Court (Joinder in Prior Motion). Document filed by Dalia Genger, Sagi Genger 1993 Trust.(Dellaportas, John)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/12/2019) (jwh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Adam Pollock dated Nov. 12, 2019 re: Kasowitz letter of Nov. 12 (ECF No. 15). Document filed by Orly Genger 1993 Trust.(Pollock, Adam)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court . addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Michael P. Bowen dated November 12, 2019. Document filed by Orly Genger.(Bowen, Michael)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Christopher K. Leung in Support re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Orly Genger 1993 Trust. (Pollock, Adam)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Orly Genger 1993 Trust. (Pollock, Adam)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Orly Genger 1993 Trust.(Pollock, Adam)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #3 MOTION to Transfer Case . (motion to transfer is moot). Document filed by Orly Genger 1993 Trust. (Pollock, Adam)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case . So Ordered. (Responses due by 11/6/2019.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/24/19) (yv)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Transfer Case . to November 6, 2019 addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Adam Pollock dated Oct. 23, 2019. Document filed by Orly Genger 1993 Trust.(Pollock, Adam)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Statement pursuant to Rule 9027(e)(3) (corrected) re: #7 Notice (Other). Document filed by Orly Genger 1993 Trust. (Pollock, Adam)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Statement pursuant to Rule 9027(e)(3) re: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Orly Genger 1993 Trust. (Pollock, Adam)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Petitioner's Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9027(E)(3). Document filed by Sagi Genger 1993 Trust. (Khinchuk, Beth)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Statement pursuant to Bank. P. 9027(e)(3). Document filed by Dalia Genger. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bachman, Judith)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Orly Genger. (Bowen, Michael)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer Case . Document filed by Orly Genger.(Bowen, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bowen, Michael)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Surrogates Court, County of New York. Case Number: 0017-2008. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17740986).Document filed by Orly Genger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: OTSC with Temporary Restraints (6/24/09), #2 Exhibit 2: OTSC with Temporary Restraints (7/01/09), #3 Exhibit 3: Affidavit in Opp. to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss (8/04/09), #4 Exhibit 4: Supp. Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraints (8/18/09), #5 Exhibit 5:OTSC to Supp Court's 7.1.09 Confirmed 8.18.09 Order (7/16/10), #6 Exhibit 6: Notice of Motion For Leave to Amend Petition (9/22/10), #7 Exhibit 7: Affidavit in Support of Motion For Leave To Amend Petition (9/22/10), #8 Exhibit 7: Affidavit in Support of Motion For Leave To Amend Petition (9/22/10)(Part 2), #9 Exhibit 8: Affirmation in Resp. to Motion for Leave to Amend Petition (9/23/10), #10 Exhibit 9:Stipulation Withdrawing OTSC signed 7.16.10 (9/24/10), #11 Exhibit 10: Reply Affidavit (9/30/10), #12 Exhibit 11: Decision (10/12/10), #13 Exhibit 12: Amended Stipulation (10/20/10), #14 Exhibit 13: Decision (10/21/10), #15 Exhibit 14: Notice of Motion to Dismiss (11/04/10), #16 Exhibit 15: Affidavit in Opp. to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss (11/16/10), #17 Exhibit 16 Reply Affirmation In Support Of Motion to Dismiss (11/22/10), #18 Exhibit 17 Stipulation Adjourning Motion to Dismiss (11/22/10), #19 Exhibit 18 Notice of Entry (1/10/11), #20 Exhibit 19 Second Amended Verified Petition and Request for TRO (1/10/11), #21 Exhibit 20 Notice of Change of Address (8/28/12), #22 Exhibit 21 Notice of Substitution of Attorneys (9/10/12), #23 Exhibit 22 Petition for A Compulsory Accounting and Related Relief (10/10/12), #24 Exhibit 23Affidavit of Service (10/16/12), #25 Exhibit 24 Third Amended Verified Petition (10/17/12), #26 Exhibit 24 Third Amended Verified Petition (10/17/12)( Part 2), #27 Exhibit 25Affirmation In Support Of Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Petition (11/19/12), #28 Exhibit 26 Citation (11/20/12), #29 Exhibit 27 Notice of Appearance and Admission of Service (12/05/12), #30 Exhibit 28: Notice of Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Petition (12/05/12), #31 Exhibit 29 Stipulation Adjourning Return Date of Citation of Petition (12/05/12), #32 Exhibit 30 Stipulation Adjourning Return Date of Respondent's Motion to Dismiss (1/08/13), #33 Exhibit 31 Stipulation Adjourning Return Date of Respondent's Motion to Dismiss (1/17/13), #34 Exhibit 32 Memo of Law In Support Of Petitioner's OTSC (2/14/13), #35 Exhibit 33 Affirmation in Support of Petitioner's OTSC (2/14/13), #36 Exhibit 33 Affirmation in Support of Petitioner's OTSC (2/14/13)(part 2), #37 Exhibit 33 Affirmation in Support of Petitioner's OTSC (2/14/13)(Part 3), #38 Exhibit 34: Sworn Statement of Orly Genger In Support of Her OTSC (2/14/13), #39 Exhibit 34: Sworn Statement of Orly Genger In Support of Her OTSC (2/14/13)(Part 20, #40 Exhibit 35 Affidavit of Service (2/14/13), #41 Exhibit 36 Order to Show Cause (2/19/13), #42 Exhibit 37 Affidavit of Service (2/25/13), #43 Exhibit 38 Affidavit of Service (2/27/13), #44 Exhibit 39Memorandum of Law In Support of Petitioner's Opp. to Motion to Dismiss (2/27/13), #45 Exhibit 40 Attorney's Statement in Opp. to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss (2/27/13), #46 Exhibit 40 Attorney's Statement in Opp. to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss (2/27/13)(Part 2), #47 Exhibit 41 Appendix Exhibits (2/27/13), #48 Exhibit 41 Appendix Exhibits (2/27/13)(Part 2), #49 Exhibit 42 Memorandum in Opp. to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Trustee (3/01/13), #50 Exhibit 43 Affirmation of R. Meister in Opp. to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Trustee (3/01/13), #51 Exhibit 43 Affirmation of R. Meister in Opp. to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Trustee (3/01/13)(part 2), #52 Exhibit 43: Affirmation of R. Meister in Opp. to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Trustee (3/01/13)(Part 3), #53 Exhibit 43: Affirmation of R. Meister in Opp. to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Trustee (3/01/13)(Part 4), #54 Exhibit 44: Affirmation of J. Dellaportas on Behalf of Respondent Sagi Trust (3/01/13), #55 Exhibit 44: Affirmation of J. Dellaportas on Behalf of Respondent Sagi Trust (3/01/13) (Part 2), #56 Exhibit 45 Affidavit of J. D. Anderson (3/01/13), #57 Exhibit 46 Affidavit of Service (3/01/13), #58 Exhibit 47 Stipulation (3/11/13), #59 Exhibit 48 Decision (3/21/13), #60 Exhibit 49 Accounting By Trustee (5/09/13), #61 Exhibit 50 Petition for Judicial Settlement of Account of Trustee (5/09/13), #62 Exhibit 51 Supp. Affirmation in Connection with the Pending Motion to Dismiss (6/19/13), #63 Exhibit 52 Decision (7/15/14), #64 Exhibit 53 Decision (7/24/14), #65 Exhibit 54 Affirmation of Bryan D. Leinbach (8/05/14), #66 Exhibit 55 Affirmation of Service (8/08/14), #67 Exhibit 56 Notice of Motion to Dismiss OTSC and Third Amended Petition (9/19/14), #68 Exhibit 57 Verified Affirmation of J. Dellaportas in Support of Motion to Dismiss (9/22/14, #69 Exhibit 57 Verified Affirmation of J. Dellaportas in Support of Motion to Dismiss (9/22/14)(Part 2), #70 Exhibit 58 : Amended Notice of Motion to Dismiss OTSC and Third Amended Petition (9/24/14), #71 Exhibit 58:Amended Notice of Motion to Dismiss OTSC and Third Amended Petition (9/24/14)(part 2), #72 Exhibit 59Beneficiary O. Genger Memo of Law in Opp to Sagi Trust Motion to Dismiss OTSC (10/23/14), #73 Exhibit 60 Affirmation of Bryan D. Leinbach (10/23/14), #74 Exhibit 61 Stipulation (11/05/14), #75 Exhibit 62 A. Sternberg Reply Memo of Law in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss (11/06/14), #76 Exhibit 63Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (12/11/14), #77 Exhibit 64 Appearance and Consent of Guardian ad Litem in a Misc. Proceeding (12/22/14), #78 Exhibit 65 Notice of Appearance (12/26/14), #79 Exhibit 66 admission of Service of The Sagi Trust Motion to Dismiss 15-03-11 -, #80 Exhibit 67 Supplemental Notice of Appearance (3/12/15), #81 Exhibit 68 Affirmation of S. Riker, Esq. In Response to D. Genger's Motion to Dismiss (3/12/15), #82 Exhibit 69 Admission of Service of The Dalia Genger Motion to Dismiss (3/12/15), #83 Exhibit 70 Decision (4/09/15), #84 Exhibit 71 Decision (4/22/15), #85 Exhibit 72 Supplemental Citation (5/06/15), #86 Exhibit 73 Notice of Appeal (5/12/15), #87 Exhibit 74 Affirmation of B. D. Leinbach (6/19/15), #88 Exhibit 75 Verified Affirmation of J. Dellaportas in Support of Motion to Dismiss (7/07/15), #89 Exhibit 75 Verified Affirmation of J. Dellaportas in Support of Motion to Dismiss (7/07/15)(Part 2), #90 Exhibit 75 Verified Affirmation of J. Dellaportas in Support of Motion to Dismiss (7/07/15)(Part 3), #91 Exhibit 75 Verified Affirmation of J. Dellaportas in Support of Motion to Dismiss (7/07/15)(Part 4), #92 Exhibit 75 Verified Affirmation of J. Dellaportas in Support of Motion to Dismiss (7/07/15)(part 5), #93 Exhibit 76 Second Supp. Notice of Motion to Dismiss Third Verified Amended Petition (7/08/15), #94 Exhibit 76 Second Supp. Notice of Motion to Dismiss Third Verified Amended Petition (7/08/15)( Part 2), #95 Exhibit 76 Second Supp. Notice of Motion to Dismiss Third Verified Amended Petition (7/08/15)( Part 3), #96 Exhibit 76 Second Supp. Notice of Motion to Dismiss Third Verified Amended Petition (7/08/15)( Part 4), #97 Exhibit 77 Verified Notice of Appearance (8/07/15), #98 Exhibit 78 Updated Notice of Motion to Dismiss Third Verified Amended Petition (8/25/15), #99 Exhibit 79 Amended Notice Resetting Return Date of Motion to Dismiss (8/25/15), #100 Exhibit 80 Affirmation in Response to S. Genger 1993 Trust's Supp. Motion to Dismiss (8/25/15), #101 Exhibit 81 Stipulation (9/16/15), #102 Exhibit 82 O. Genger Memo of Law in Opp. to S. Genger 1993 Trust's Motion to Dismiss (10/13/15), #103 Exhibit 82 O. Genger Memo of Law in Opp. to S. Genger 1993 Trust's Motion to Dismiss (10/13/15)(part 2), #104 Exhibit 82 O. Genger Memo of Law in Opp. to S. Genger 1993 Trust's Motion to Dismiss (10/13/15)(part 3), #105 Exhibit 82 O. Genger Memo of Law in Opp. to S. Genger 1993 Trust's Motion to Dismiss (10/13/15)(Part 4), #106 Exhibit 83 O. Genger Response to Dalia's Unauthorized Supp. Filing on Her Motion to Dismiss (10/13/15), #107 Exhibit 83 O. Genger Response to Dalia's Unauthorized Supp. Filing on Her Motion to Dismiss (10/13/15)(part 2), #108 Exhibit 83 O. Genger Response to Dalia's Unauthorized Supp. Filing on Her Motion to Dismiss (10/13/15)(Part 3), #109 Exhibit 83 O. Genger Response to Dalia's Unauthorized Supp. Filing on Her Motion to Dismiss (10/13/15)(part 4), #110 Exhibit 83 O. Genger Response to Dalia's Unauthorized Supp. Filing on Her Motion to Dismiss (10/13/15)(Part 5), #111 Exhibit 83 O. Genger Response to Dalia's Unauthorized Supp. Filing on Her Motion to Dismiss (10/13/15)(Part 6), #112 Exhibit 84 Affirmation of S. Riker, Esq. in Opp. to The Sagi Trust's Motion to Dismiss (10/20/15), #113 Exhibit 85 Stipulation Adjourning the Motions to Dismiss the Third Amended Petition (10/23/15), #114 Exhibit 86 The S. Genger 1993 Trust's Reply Memo in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss (11/04/15), #115 Exhibit 87 Notice of Appearance (2/14/17), #116 Exhibit 88 Substitution of Counsel (2/15/17), #117 Exhibit 89 Stipulation of Withdrawal of Counsel (2/15/17), #118 Exhibit 90 Affirmation of Service (2/16/17), #119 Exhibit 91 Notice of Change of Firm Name (4/14/17), #120 Exhibit 92 Decision (6/21/17), #121 Exhibit 93 Notice of Entry (7/13/17), #122 Exhibit 94 Answer of D. Genger to Third Amended Petition (7/31/17), #123 Exhibit 95 Answer of Sagi Genger 1993 Trust (7/31/17), #124 Exhibit 96 Amended Answer of D. Genger to Third Amended Petition and Cross-Petition (8/22/17), #125 Exhibit 97 Notice of Motion to Dismiss Cross-Petition (9/08/17), #126 Exhibit 98 Memo of Law in Support of Petitioner's Motion to Dismiss D. Genger's Cross-Petition (9/08/17), #127 Exhibit 99 Affirmation of M. Bowen (9/08/17), #128 Exhibit 100 Opposition Affirmation on Behalf of Sagi Trust (Corrected) (9/23/17), #129 Exhibit 101 Memo of Law of D. Genger in Opp. to O. Genger Motion to Dismiss Cross-Petition (9/25/17), #130 Exhibit 102 Affirmation of J. Bachman in Opp. to Motion to Dismiss Cross-Petition (9/24/17), #131 Exhibit 102 Affirmation of J. Bachman in Opp. t

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genger v. Genger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Orly Genger
Represented By: Michael Paul Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dalia Genger
Represented By: Judith Lisa Bachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sagi Genger 1993 Trust
Represented By: John Dellaportas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Orly Genger 1993 Trust
Represented By: Adam Lewis Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?