Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. Shavel Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Klauber Brothers, Inc.
Defendant: Home Depot, Inc., J. C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Macy's, Inc., Bluestem Sales, Inc., QVC, Inc., Shavel Associates, Inc., Does 1 through 10, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Walmart Inc., Bed Bath & Beyond and Boscov's, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv09320
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Maria Zaharia on behalf of Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Zaharia, Laura)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 Motion for Timothy D. Pecsenye to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2019) (va)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Blake D. Fink to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2019) (va)
November 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Timothy D. Pecsenye to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18037500. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Timothy D. Pecsenye to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18037500. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bed Bath & Beyond, Bluestem Sales, Inc., Boscov's, Inc, Home Depot, Inc., J. C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Macy's, Inc., QVC, Inc., Shavel Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc..(Pecsenye, Timothy)
November 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Blake D. Fink to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18037281. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Blake D. Fink to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18037281. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bed Bath & Beyond, Bluestem Sales, Inc., Boscov's, Inc, Home Depot, Inc., J. C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Macy's, Inc., Shavel Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc..(Flanders, Craig)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Matthew Flanders on behalf of Bed Bath & Beyond, Bluestem Sales, Inc., Boscov's, Inc, Home Depot, Inc., J. C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Macy's, Inc., Shavel Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Flanders, Craig)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bed Bath & Beyond, Bluestem Sales, Inc., Boscov's, Inc, Does 1 through 10, Home Depot, Inc., J. C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Macy's, Inc., QVC, Inc., Shavel Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (dnh)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shavel Associates, Inc.; Bed Bath & Beyond; Boscov's, Inc.; Bluestem Sales, Inc.; Home Depot, Inc.; J. C. Penney Corporation, Inc.; Macy's, Inc.; QVC, Inc.; Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.; Walmart Inc.; Does 1 through 10, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (dnh)
October 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Alan Burroughs. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Klauber Brothers, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Burroughs, Scott)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Burroughs, Scott)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc..(Burroughs, Scott)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bed Bath & Beyond, Bluestem Sales, Inc., Boscov's, Inc, Does 1 through 10, Home Depot, Inc., J. C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Macy's, Inc., QVC, Inc., Shavel Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17740664)Document filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc..(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. Shavel Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy D. Pecsenye
Represented By: Craig Matthew Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy D. Pecsenye
Represented By: Craig Matthew Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy D. Pecsenye
Represented By: Craig Matthew Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluestem Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy D. Pecsenye
Represented By: Craig Matthew Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QVC, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy D. Pecsenye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shavel Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy D. Pecsenye
Represented By: Craig Matthew Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy D. Pecsenye
Represented By: Craig Matthew Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Timothy D. Pecsenye
Represented By: Craig Matthew Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond
Represented By: Timothy D. Pecsenye
Represented By: Craig Matthew Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boscov's, Inc
Represented By: Timothy D. Pecsenye
Represented By: Craig Matthew Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klauber Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Alan Burroughs
Represented By: Laura Maria Zaharia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?