Booker v. Mico'Levo et al
Plaintiff: Diquan Booker
Defendant: Officer Mico'Levo and Shawangunk Correctional Facility
Case Number: 1:2019cv09373
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Mailed a copy of #20 Order, to Diquan Booker 16A1691 SHAWANGUNK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY P.O. Box 700 Wallkill, NY 12589. (aea)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TRANSFER ORDER. Venue lies in the Northern District of New York, 28 U.S.C. 1391(b)(2), and this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York, 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/10/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (rjm).
October 10, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm)
October 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 2:19-cv-04571. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TRANSFER ORDER - The Clerk of the Court is directed to: (1) transfer this case to the Southern District of New York forthwith; (2) mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff; and (3) mark this case CLOSED. Case transferred to Southern District of New York. Original file, copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent electronically. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 10/7/2019. C/M (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from Pro Se Office dated 9/27/2019 Re: In response to Plaintiff's four letters to Court. (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from Diquan Booker. (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 Letter from Diquan Booker. (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 Letter from Diquan Booker. (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Diquan Booker. (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Diquan Booker to Pro Se Office dated 9/9/2019. (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Diquan Booker dated 8/22/19. (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Diquan Booker to Clerk dated 8/16/19 Re: Officers at Shawangunk Correctional Facility. (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Pro Se Dept. to Diquan Booker dated August 20, 2019 in response to #8 Letter; We received your pro-bono application for case 19-CV-4571. If you wish to file a pro-bono application for the other two pending cases (19-CV-3864 and 19-CV-3758); please fill out the application completely and clearly state the case number on each. Enclosed find two pro-bono applications. (Cubano, Jazmin) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Diquan Booker dated 8/15/2019 re pro-bono form. (Cubano, Jazmin) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Diquan Booker. (Cubano, Jazmin) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER dated 8/12/2019 from Pro Se Office to Diquan Booker. This letter acknowledges receipt of your civil action(s). (Coleman, Laurie) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Related Cases: 19-cv-3758-JS and 19-cv-3864-JS-AKT (Cox, Dwayne) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Authorization (Cox, Dwayne) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Diquan Booker. (Cox, Dwayne) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Diquan Booker. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Booker v. Mico'Levo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diquan Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Mico'Levo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawangunk Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?