Johnson v. DCM Erectors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Derrick L. Johnson
Defendant: DCM Erectors, Inc. and John Doe 1
Case Number: 1:2019cv09377
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331vc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Derrick L. Johnson were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
December 4, 2019 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #4 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
December 4, 2019 Appeal Remark as to #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Derrick L. Johnson. IFP DENIED 10/10/2019. (tp)
December 4, 2019 Appeal Fee Due: for #4 Notice of Appeal. Appeal fee due by 12/18/2019. (tp)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #3 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), #2 Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Derrick L. Johnson. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (tp)
October 11, 2019 Mailed a copy of #3 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), #2 Order of Dismissal, Notice of Appeal Forms, to Derrick L. Johnson ID No. AY-7574 Kern Valley State Prison (KVSP) P.O. Box 5104 Delanoica, CA 93216. (vba)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice under the Prison Litigation Reform Act's "three-strikes" rule. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Plaintiff continues to be barred from filing any civil action under the in forma pauperis (IFP) statute while a prisoner unless Plaintiff is under imminent danger of serious physical injury. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/10/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Court directs the Clerk of Court to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Court dismisses this action without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Plaintiff remains barred from filing any federal civil action IFP while he is a prisoner, unless he is under imminent danger of serious physical injury. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/10/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 10, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm)
October 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DCM Erectors, Inc., John Doe 1. Document filed by Derrick L. Johnson. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. DCM Erectors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCM Erectors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?