Cordero et al v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Giovani De Jesus Cordero and Tinatin Davituri
Defendant: Acting Director KEN CUCCINELLI, Director Christopher A. Wray, Acting Commissioner Mark A. Morgan, Associate Director DONALD NEUFELD, Secretary of State Mike Pompeo, Special Agent Michael J Driscoll, Director Conn Schrader, Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan, US Attorney General William Barr, Charg dAffaires Elizabeth Rood, Michael J Driscoll, Mike Pompeo, Conn Schrader, Elizabeth Rood, Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, William Barr, Donald Neufeld, Christopher A. Wray and Mark A. Morgan
Case Number: 1:2019cv09475
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Michael J Driscoll, Kevin McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan, Donald Neufeld, Mike Pompeo, Elizabeth Rood, Conn Schrader, Christopher A. Wray. (dnh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William Barr; Kevin Mcaleenan; Ken Cuccinelli; Michael J. Driscoll; Christopher A. Wray; Mark A. Morgan; Donald Neufeld; Mike Pompeo; Conn Schrader; Elizabeth Rood, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,,. Document filed by Giovani De Jesus Cordero, Tinatin Davituri. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Defendants' Addresses)(Grosz, Allison)
October 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Allison N Grosz to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. The form used for the summons is blank. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
October 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Allison N Grosz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings. (dnh)
October 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Allison N Grosz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: William Barr, KEN CUCCINELLI, Michael J Driscoll, Kevin McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan, DONALD NEUFELD, Mike Pompeo, Elizabeth Rood, Conn Schrader, Christopher A. Wray. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. William Barr served on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; KEN CUCCINELLI served on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Michael J Driscoll served on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Kevin McAleenan served on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Mark A. Morgan served on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; DONALD NEUFELD served on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Mike Pompeo served on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Elizabeth Rood served on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Conn Schrader served on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Christopher A. Wray served on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Tinatin Davituri; Giovani De Jesus Cordero. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Grosz, Allison) Modified on 10/15/2019 (dnh).
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Grosz, Allison)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 FIRST COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against William Barr, KEN CUCCINELLI, Michael J Driscoll, Kevin McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan, DONALD NEUFELD, Mike Pompeo, Elizabeth Rood, Conn Schrader, Christopher A. Wray (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17767006).Document filed by Tinatin Davituri, Giovani De Jesus Cordero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Grosz, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cordero et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director KEN CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Mark A. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Director DONALD NEUFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Mike Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Agent Michael J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Conn Schrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charg dAffaires Elizabeth Rood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Driscoll
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pompeo
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conn Schrader
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Rood
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Morgan
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovani De Jesus Cordero
Represented By: Allison N Grosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tinatin Davituri
Represented By: Allison N Grosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?