Yang v. Guest of a Guest, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephen Yang
Defendant: Guest of a Guest, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv09531
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Referring Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Guest of a Guest, Inc..(Sholder, Scott)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Guest of a Guest, Inc..(Sholder, Scott)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Marie Gates on behalf of Guest of a Guest, Inc.. (Gates, Sara)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy Evelyn Wolff on behalf of Guest of a Guest, Inc.. (Wolff, Nancy)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Jonathan Sholder on behalf of Guest of a Guest, Inc.. (Sholder, Scott)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and for Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/22/2019) (rjm)
October 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Guest of a Guest, Inc.. (jgo)
October 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Guest of a Guest, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephen Yang. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Guest of a Guest, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17777543)Document filed by Stephen Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang v. Guest of a Guest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guest of a Guest, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Gates
Represented By: Nancy Evelyn Wolff
Represented By: Scott Jonathan Sholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Yang
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?