Barbera v. Justin Bieber Brands, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert Barbera
Defendant: Justin Bieber and Justin Bieber Brands, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv09532
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF CIVIL ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i)): IT IS HEREBY NOTICED that there has been a settlement in the above case and that the above case should be dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/21/2019) (mro)
October 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Robert Barbera. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Justin Bieber, Justin Bieber Brands, LLC. (jgo)
October 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Justin Bieber Brands, LLC and Justin Bieber, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert Barbera. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Justin Bieber, Justin Bieber Brands, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17777675)Document filed by Robert Barbera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbera v. Justin Bieber Brands, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Bieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Bieber Brands, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Barbera
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?