Eddystone Rail Company, LLC v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Eddystone Rail Company, LLC
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Pontus Holdings, Ltd., Capital One, N.A., The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Fifth Third Bank, BMO Harris Bank, N.A., CIBC Bank USA (f/k/a/ The PrivateBank & Trust Company), Tao Talents, LLC, Bank of America, N.A., PNC Bank, National Association, TPG Specialty Lending, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Suntrust Bank, PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc., CIBC Bank USA and PrivateBank & Trust Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv09584
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:632
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a corrected oral argument proceeding held on 2/4/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: corrected oral argument held on 2/4/2021 before Judge George B. Daniels. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Buchwald, Lara)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/4/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/4/2021 before Judge George B. Daniels. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Oral Argument held on 2/4/2021 re: #58 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Tao Talents, LLC, Pontus Holdings, Ltd., PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc., TPG Specialty Lending, Inc., #55 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, U.S. Bank National Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Suntrust Bank, Capital One, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Fifth Third Bank Plaintiff Counsel: Daniel Hershel Tabak; Defense Counsel: Lara Samet Buchwaldd, Michael Lewis Cook and Court Reporter present. (Vega, Elizabeth)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: The oral argument scheduled to occur on February 2, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby adjourned to February 4, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. (Oral Argument set for 2/4/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/2/2021) (jwh)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: The oral argument scheduled for February 2, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. shall occur as a videoconference using the Skype platform. Co-counsel, members of the press, and the public may access the audio feed of the conference by calling (917) 933-2166 and entering the conference ID 415583208. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 2/2/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/21/2021) (jca)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tina Hwa Joe on behalf of BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, Capital One, N.A., Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc., Suntrust Bank, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A...(Joe, Tina)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 DECLARATION of Robert J. Ward in Support re: #58 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc., Pontus Holdings, Ltd., TPG Specialty Lending, Inc., Tao Talents, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-First Affidavit of Philip Charles Taylor, #2 Exhibit B-Voluntary Petition for Bankruptcy, #3 Exhibit C-Entry of Appearance).(Ward, Robert)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #58 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc., Pontus Holdings, Ltd., TPG Specialty Lending, Inc., Tao Talents, LLC..(Cook, Michael)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #55 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, Capital One, N.A., Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc., Suntrust Bank, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A...(Buchwald, Lara)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #60 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. The status conference scheduled to occur on 2/2/2021 at 10:30 a.m. is converted to an oral argument on Defendants' motion to dismiss, (ECF NOs. 55 and 58). The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at ECF No. 60. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/19/2021) (tro)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Lara Samet Buchwald dated January 15, 2021 re: Clarification Regarding Oral Argument. Document filed by BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, Capital One, N.A., Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc., Suntrust Bank, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A...(Buchwald, Lara)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #64 Letter filed by Eddystone Rail Company, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/22/2020) (ama)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 DECLARATION of Marvin J. Lowenthal in Opposition re: #58 MOTION to Dismiss ., #55 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Eddystone Rail Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Tabak, Daniel)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #58 MOTION to Dismiss ., #55 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Eddystone Rail Company, LLC..(Tabak, Daniel)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Daniel H. Tabak dated December 17, 2020 re: Request to Extend Page Limits on Brief Opposing Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Eddystone Rail Company, LLC..(Tabak, Daniel)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 JOINDER to join re: #55 MOTION to Dismiss ., #56 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, . Document filed by PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc...(Buchwald, Lara)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Jay Portnoy on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, Capital One, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc., Suntrust Bank, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A...(Portnoy, Lawrence)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lara Samet Buchwald on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, Capital One, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc., Suntrust Bank, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A...(Buchwald, Lara)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Lara Samet Buchwald dated October 22, 2020. Document filed by BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, Capital One, N.A., Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Suntrust Bank, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A...(Buchwald, Lara)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #58 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc., Pontus Holdings, Ltd., TPG Specialty Lending, Inc., Tao Talents, LLC..(Cook, Michael)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc., Pontus Holdings, Ltd., TPG Specialty Lending, Inc., Tao Talents, LLC..(Cook, Michael)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Lewis Cook on behalf of PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc., Pontus Holdings, Ltd., TPG Specialty Lending, Inc., Tao Talents, LLC..(Cook, Michael)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #55 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, Capital One, N.A., Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Suntrust Bank, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A...(Buchwald, Lara)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, Capital One, N.A., Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Suntrust Bank, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Return Date set for 2/2/2021 at 10:30 AM..(Buchwald, Lara)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: The parties' stipulated briefing schedule is GRANTED and is as follows: Defendants shall answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, (ECF No. 1-1), on or before October 22, 2020. Plaintiff shall file its opposition on or before December 21, 2020. Defendants shall file its reply on or before January 21, 2021. All counsel in the above-captioned case are directed to appear before this Court on February 2, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. for a status conference and/or oral argument. (Motions due by 10/22/2020. Responses due by 12/21/2020. Replies due by 1/21/2021. Oral Argument set for 2/2/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. Status Conference set for 2/2/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/2/2020) (jwh)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Robert J. Ward dated October 1, 2020 re: Requesting an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Document filed by Pontus Holdings, Ltd., TPG Specialty Lending, Inc., Tao Talents, LLC..(Ward, Robert)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying #37 Motion to Remand: Accordingly, Plaintiffs motion to remand, (ECF No. 37), is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion accordingly. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/27/2020) (jwh)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Buchwald, Lara)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for U.S. Bank National Association. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association..(Buchwald, Lara)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: The June 9, 2020 oral argument is cancelled. Plaintiff's motion to remand, (ECF No. 37), will be decided on submission without oral argument. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/27/2020) (ks)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #37 MOTION to Remand . . Document filed by Eddystone Rail Company, LLC..(Tabak, Daniel)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: The April 7, 2020 oral argument is adjourned to June 9, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. SO ORDERED., ( Oral Argument set for 6/9/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/24/2020) (ama)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Truist Bank for Suntrust Bank. Document filed by Suntrust Bank..(Buchwald, Lara)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: The initial conference scheduled for February 11, 2020 is canceled. The status conference currently scheduled for April 7, 2020 is canceled. This Court will hear oral argument on Plaintiff's motion to remand, (ECF No. 37), on April 7, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. SO ORDERED., ( Oral Argument set for 4/7/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/30/2020) (ama)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Lara Samet Buchwald dated January 29, 2020 re: Consensual Request to Adjourn Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, Capital One, N.A., Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Suntrust Bank, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Buchwald, Lara)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #37 MOTION to Remand . . Document filed by BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, Capital One, N.A., Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc., Pontus Holdings, Ltd., Suntrust Bank, TPG Specialty Lending, Inc., Tao Talents, LLC, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Buchwald, Lara)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #41 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #37 MOTION to Remand: Responses due by 1/27/2020, Replies due by 3/27/2020.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/19/2019) (jwh)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Lara Samet Buchwald dated December 18, 2019 re: Agreed Modification to Proposed Briefing Schedule on Motion to Remand. Document filed by BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, Capital One, N.A., Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Suntrust Bank, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Buchwald, Lara)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 18, 2019 re: Courtesy Copies of Motion Papers. Document filed by Eddystone Rail Company, LLC.(Lowenthal, Marvin)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DECLARATION of Marvin J. Lowenthal in Support re: #37 MOTION to Remand .. Document filed by Eddystone Rail Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 15, 2019, #2 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 15, 2019, #3 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 15, 2019, #4 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 15, 2019, #5 Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 15, 2019, #6 Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 15, 2019, #7 Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 15, 2019, #8 Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 15, 2019, #9 Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 15, 2019, #10 Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 15, 2019, #11 Exhibit 11 to the Declaration of Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 15, 2019, #12 Exhibit 12 to the Declaration of Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 15, 2019, #13 Exhibit 13 to the Declaration of Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 15, 2019, #14 Exhibit 14 to the Declaration of Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 15, 2019, #15 Exhibit 15 to the Declaration of Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 15, 2019, #16 Exhibit 16 to the Declaration of Marvin J. Lowenthal dated November 15, 2019)(Tabak, Daniel)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #37 MOTION to Remand . . Document filed by Eddystone Rail Company, LLC. (Tabak, Daniel)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Remand . Document filed by Eddystone Rail Company, LLC.(Tabak, Daniel)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Pontus Private Trust Co. Ltd. for Pontus Holdings, Ltd.. Document filed by Pontus Holdings, Ltd..(Ward, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. for PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc.. Document filed by PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc..(Ward, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #33 Letter, filed by The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, U.S. Bank National Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Suntrust Bank, Capital One, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Fifth Third Bank. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/7/2019) (rro)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert J. Ward to RE-FILE Document #29 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #30 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file these documents and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (ldi)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Lara Samet Buchwald dated November 6, 2019 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule on Motion to Remand and Request for Adjournment. Document filed by BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, Capital One, N.A., Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Suntrust Bank, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Buchwald, Lara)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by TPG Specialty Lending, Inc..(Ward, Robert)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tao Talents, LLC.(Ward, Robert)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pontus Holdings, Ltd..(Ward, Robert) Modified on 11/8/2019 (ldi).
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc..(Ward, Robert) Modified on 11/8/2019 (ldi).
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Joinder in Removal of Civil Action for Fifth Third Bank and BMO Harris Bank, N.A., 7.1 Statements for Fifth Third Bank and BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Appearance of Lawrence Portnoy, Appearance of Lara Samet Buchwald, and Letter to Judge Daniels regarding Pretrial Conference Order, with Exhibit 1 served on Eddystone Rail Company, LLC, TPG Specialty Lending., Inc., PNC Bank, Natl Assoc., Tao Talents, LLC, and Pontus Holdings, Ltd. on October 25, 2019. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, Capital One, N.A., Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Suntrust Bank, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Buchwald, Lara)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Enbridge Inc., Corporate Parent Enbridge Rail (Philadelphia) L.L.C., Corporate Parent Enbridge (US) Inc., Corporate Parent Enbridge US Holdings Inc. for Eddystone Rail Company, LLC. Document filed by Eddystone Rail Company, LLC.(Tabak, Daniel)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marvin Jules Lowenthal on behalf of Eddystone Rail Company, LLC. (Lowenthal, Marvin)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Matthew Sinaiko on behalf of Eddystone Rail Company, LLC. (Sinaiko, Stephen)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Hershel Tabak on behalf of Eddystone Rail Company, LLC. (Tabak, Daniel)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Walter Olander on behalf of PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc., Pontus Holdings, Ltd., TPG Specialty Lending, Inc., Tao Talents, LLC. (Olander, Frank)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert J. Ward on behalf of PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc., Pontus Holdings, Ltd., TPG Specialty Lending, Inc., Tao Talents, LLC. (Ward, Robert)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Lara Samet Buchwald dated October 23, 2019 re: In Accordance with the Pretrial Conference Order. Document filed by BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, Capital One, N.A., Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Suntrust Bank, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - E-Mail Correspondence Between Counsel Regarding Pretrial Conference Order)(Buchwald, Lara)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JOINDER to join re: #1 Notice of Removal,,, . Document filed by BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Fifth Third Bank.(Buchwald, Lara)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Fifth Third Bancorp., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Fifth Third Bank Financial Corporation for Fifth Third Bank. Document filed by Fifth Third Bank.(Buchwald, Lara)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal, Other Affiliate BMO Financial Corp. for BMO Harris Bank, N.A.. Document filed by BMO Harris Bank, N.A..(Buchwald, Lara)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Jay Portnoy on behalf of BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Fifth Third Bank. (Portnoy, Lawrence)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lara Samet Buchwald on behalf of BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Fifth Third Bank. (Buchwald, Lara)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Related Case Statement, 7.1 Statements for Bank of America, N.A., Capital One, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., SunTrust Bank, CIBC Bank USA (f/k/a/ The PrivateBank & Trust Company), and U.S. Bank National Association, Appearance of Lawrence Portnoy, Appearance of Lara Samet Buchwald, Individual Rules of Judge George B. Daniels, Individual Rules of Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein, and ECF Rules and Instructions served on Eddystone Rail Company, LLC on 10/22/2019. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA, Capital One, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc., Pontus Holdings, Ltd., Suntrust Bank, TPG Specialty Lending, Inc., Tao Talents, LLC, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Buchwald, Lara)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/21/2019) (jwh)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 17cv1266 and declined by Judge William H. Pauley and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED TO Judge William H. Pauley as possibly related to 1:17-cv-01266-WHP. (dnh)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lara Samet Buchwald. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: PNC Bank, National Association, CIBC Bank USA (f/k/a/ The PrivateBank & Trust Company). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Coporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank of America, N.A.. Document filed by Bank of America, N.A..(Buchwald, Lara)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Other Affiliate WFC Holdings, LLC for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Buchwald, Lara)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association.(Buchwald, Lara)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Other Affiliate CIBC Bancorp USA Inc. for CIBC Bank USA (f/k/a/ The PrivateBank & Trust Company). Document filed by CIBC Bank USA (f/k/a/ The PrivateBank & Trust Company).(Buchwald, Lara)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent SunTrust Banks, Inc., Other Affiliate Suntrust Bank Holding Company for Suntrust Bank. Document filed by Suntrust Bank.(Buchwald, Lara)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. for The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd.. Document filed by The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd..(Buchwald, Lara)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One, N.A.. Document filed by Capital One, N.A..(Buchwald, Lara)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Buchwald, Lara)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Jay Portnoy on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA (f/k/a/ The PrivateBank & Trust Company), Capital One, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Suntrust Bank, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Portnoy, Lawrence)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lara Samet Buchwald on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA (f/k/a/ The PrivateBank & Trust Company), Capital One, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Suntrust Bank, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Buchwald, Lara)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:17-cv-01266-WHP. Document filed by BMO Harris Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., CIBC Bank USA (f/k/a/ The PrivateBank & Trust Company), Capital One, N.A., Fifth Third Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., PNC Bank, National Association, Pontus Holdings, Ltd., Suntrust Bank, TPG Specialty Lending, Inc., Tao Talents, LLC, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Buchwald, Lara)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Buchwald, Lara)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653614-2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17784994).Document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, Capital One, N.A., The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., BMO Harris Bank, N.A., TPG Specialty Lending, Inc., Bank of America, N.A., Tao Talents, LLC, Pontus Holdings, Ltd., Suntrust Bank, Fifth Third Bank, CIBC Bank USA (f/k/a/ The PrivateBank & Trust Company), PNC Bank, National Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B - 2009 BofA Credit Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - 2009 SDNY Arbitration Award Petition, #4 Exhibit D - E.D. Pa. FAC, #5 Exhibit E - E.D. Sur-Reply Opposing MTD)(Buchwald, Lara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eddystone Rail Company, LLC v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lara Samet Buchwald
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Portnoy
Represented By: Tina Hwa Joe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pontus Holdings, Ltd.
Represented By: Robert J. Ward
Represented By: Frank Walter Olander
Represented By: Michael Lewis Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: Lara Samet Buchwald
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Portnoy
Represented By: Tina Hwa Joe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd.
Represented By: Lara Samet Buchwald
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Portnoy
Represented By: Tina Hwa Joe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Lara Samet Buchwald
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Portnoy
Represented By: Tina Hwa Joe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Lara Samet Buchwald
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Portnoy
Represented By: Tina Hwa Joe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lara Samet Buchwald
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Portnoy
Represented By: Tina Hwa Joe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIBC Bank USA (f/k/a/ The PrivateBank & Trust Company)
Represented By: Lara Samet Buchwald
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tao Talents, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Ward
Represented By: Frank Walter Olander
Represented By: Michael Lewis Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Lara Samet Buchwald
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Portnoy
Represented By: Tina Hwa Joe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG Specialty Lending, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Ward
Represented By: Frank Walter Olander
Represented By: Michael Lewis Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lara Samet Buchwald
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Portnoy
Represented By: Tina Hwa Joe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Bank
Represented By: Lara Samet Buchwald
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Portnoy
Represented By: Tina Hwa Joe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, Nat'l Assoc.
Represented By: Robert J. Ward
Represented By: Frank Walter Olander
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Portnoy
Represented By: Lara Samet Buchwald
Represented By: Tina Hwa Joe
Represented By: Michael Lewis Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIBC Bank USA
Represented By: Lara Samet Buchwald
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Portnoy
Represented By: Tina Hwa Joe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PrivateBank & Trust Company
Represented By: Lara Samet Buchwald
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Portnoy
Represented By: Tina Hwa Joe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddystone Rail Company, LLC
Represented By: Marvin Jules Lowenthal
Represented By: Daniel Hershel Tabak
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Sinaiko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?