BNP Paribas v. Kurt Orban Partners LLC et al
Plaintiff: BNP Paribas
Defendant: Kurt Orban Partners LLC and Matt Orban
Case Number: 1:2019cv09616
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION: NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiff BNPP and Defendants KOP and Orban that: (i) each of the Defendants hereby waives any and all defenses based on insufficient or improper service of process; and (ii) the time for Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned action is extended to and includes December 16, 2019. SO ORDERED. Kurt Orban Partners LLC answer due 12/16/2019; Matt Orban answer due 12/16/2019. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/14/2019) (rj)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by BNP Paribas. (Annunziata, Michelle)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle J. Annunziata on behalf of BNP Paribas. (Annunziata, Michelle)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Matt Orban served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. Service was accepted by Martin Doe. Document filed by BNP Paribas. (Spehr, Richard)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Kurt Orban Partners LLC served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. Service was accepted by Martin Doe, Office Manager. Document filed by BNP Paribas. (Spehr, Richard)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Matt Orban. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kurt Orban Partners LLC. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard A. Spehr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State). (dnh)
October 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard A. Spehr. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Richard A. Spehr. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Matt Orban, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by BNP Paribas. (Spehr, Richard)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kurt Orban Partners LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by BNP Paribas. (Spehr, Richard)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BNP Paribas.(Spehr, Richard)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Spehr, Richard)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kurt Orban Partners LLC, Matt Orban. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17791618)Document filed by BNP Paribas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Spehr, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNP Paribas v. Kurt Orban Partners LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Orban Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Orban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNP Paribas
Represented By: Richard A. Spehr
Represented By: Michelle J. Annunziata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?