Verch v. BDG Media, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marco Verch
Defendant: BDG Media, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv09618
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Debra C Freeman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/10/2019) (jwh)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by BDG Media, Inc..(Lackman, Eleanor)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BDG Media, Inc..(Lackman, Eleanor)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #7 Letter filed by BDG Media, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (BDG Media, Inc. answer due 12/7/2019.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/12/2019) (jwh)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Eleanor M. Lackman dated 11/07/2019 re: Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Document filed by BDG Media, Inc..(Lackman, Eleanor)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eleanor Martine Lackman on behalf of BDG Media, Inc.. (Lackman, Eleanor)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/18/2019) (jwh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BDG Media, Inc.. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BDG Media, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marco Verch. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BDG Media, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17792123)Document filed by Marco Verch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verch v. BDG Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDG Media, Inc.
Represented By: Eleanor Martine Lackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Verch
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?